EP2699021 - Method and apparatus for own-voice sensing in a hearing assistance device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Starkey Laboratories, Inc. 6600 Washington Avenue South Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2014/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burns, Thomas Howard 3328 Zarthan Avenue S. St. Louis Park Minnesota 55416 / US | 02 /
Jensen, Lars Tuborg 8006 Hemlock Circle Eden Prairie Minnesota 55347 / US | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2014/08] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13179859.7 | 09.08.2013 | [2014/08] | Priority number, date | US201261682589P | 13.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261682589 P | [2014/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2699021 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2699021 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, // H04R1/38 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
H04R25/60 (EP,US);
H04R25/00 (US);
H04R25/453 (US);
H04R25/604 (EP,US);
H04R1/38 (EP,US);
H04R2225/023 (US);
H04R2225/025 (EP,US);
H04R2225/43 (EP,US);
H04R2410/05 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/08] | H04R25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung der eigenen Stimme in einer Hörhilfevorrichtung | [2014/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for own-voice sensing in a hearing assistance device | [2014/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil de détection de sa propre voix dans un dispositif d'aide auditive | [2014/08] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 07.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.08.2013 | AL | 06.07.2016 | AT | 06.07.2016 | BE | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | IT | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | MK | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | RS | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | SM | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | IE | 09.08.2016 | LU | 09.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 09.08.2013 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 09.08.2016 | ||
LU | 09.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 09.08.2013 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 09.08.2016 | ||
LU | 09.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.08.2013 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 09.08.2016 | ||
LU | 09.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 09.08.2016 | ||
LU | 09.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 09.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010119086 (FUKUDA MIKIO [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-3, 10 *; | [XAI]US2010172523 (BURNS THOMAS HOWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11,13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1A-1C, 6 * [A] 4-9,12,15 [I] 10,14; | [A]US2010246860 (RYE RYAN P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US5692059 | US2007127757 | US2011243385 |