EP2837431 - Nozzle element for inserting a liquid into a joint, and method for introducing a liquid into a joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buck, Manuel Vogelsangstrasse 7 5412 Gebenstorf / CH | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 13180457.7 | 14.08.2013 | [2015/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2837431 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/00, B05B1/34, B05C5/02, E04F21/165 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
B05C17/00516 (EP,US);
B29C65/481 (US);
E04F21/1652 (EP,US);
B29K2083/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Düsenelement zum Einbringen einer Flüssigkeit in eine Fuge sowie Verfahren zum Einbringen einer Flüssigkeit in eine Fuge | [2015/08] | English: | Nozzle element for inserting a liquid into a joint, and method for introducing a liquid into a joint | [2015/08] | French: | Elément de buse pour l'introduction d'un liquide dans un joint et procédé d'introduction d'un liquide dans un joint | [2015/08] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2013 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 19.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012272894 (SCHUSTER TIMOTHY M [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,11,12 * paragraphs [0009] , [0021]; figures 1a,1b *; | [X]US2004086321 (BURKHOLZ JONATHAN KARL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,8,11,12 * figure 9 * |