EP2671538 - Methods For Making Oxidation Resistant Polymeric Material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | For all designated states Cambridge Polymer Group, Inc. 56 Roland Street, Suite 310 Boston, MA 02129 / US | [2017/08] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL 13th Street, Building 149, Suite 5036 Charlestown, MA 02129-2000 / US | ||
For all designated states Cambridge Polymer Group, Inc. 52-R Roland Street Boston, MA 02129-1234 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muratoglu, Orhun K. 5 Dana Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 02 /
Spiegelberg, Stephen H. 8 Horn Pond Brook Road Winchester, MA 01890 / US | [2014/31] |
Former [2013/50] | 01 /
Muratoglu, Orhun, K. 5 Dana Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02138 / US | ||
02 /
Spiegelberg, Stephen, H. 8 Horn Pond Brook Road Winchester, MA Massachusetts 01890 / US | Representative(s) | Bates, Alan Douglas Henry Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Bates, Alan Douglas Henry Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13180485.8 | 15.01.2004 | [2013/50] | Priority number, date | US20030440389P | 16.01.2003 Original published format: US 440389 P | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2671538 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, C08K5/1545, A61L27/16, A61L27/50, B29C35/08, B29C43/00, C08K5/00, C08L23/06 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
A61L27/16 (EP,US);
B29C35/0805 (US);
A61L27/505 (EP,US);
A61L29/041 (US);
A61L29/143 (US);
A61L31/048 (US);
A61L31/143 (US);
B29C43/003 (EP,US);
C08J3/28 (US);
C08K5/005 (EP,US);
C08K5/1545 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L2312/06 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49995 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/16, C08L23/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von oxidationsbeständigem Polymermaterial | [2013/50] | English: | Methods For Making Oxidation Resistant Polymeric Material | [2013/50] | French: | Procédés de fabrication de matériau polymère résistant à l'oxydation | [2013/50] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 10.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/33] | 19.03.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.04.2018 | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/33] | 19.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04702484.9 / EP1596755 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040702484) is 13.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001027345 (MERRILL EDWARD W [US], et al); | [X]US6355215 (POGGIE ROBERT [US], et al) | by applicant | US5827904 | US5879400 | EP0995450 | WO0180778 | WO0226464 | US6448315 | US6641617 | WO1997US02220 | WO1999US16070 |