EP2840387 - Lock-in thermography method and system for hot spot localization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DCG Systems, Inc. 45900 Northport Loop East Fremont, CA 94538 / US | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states DCG Systems, Inc. 45900 Northport Loop East Fremont, CA 94538 / US | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Christian c/o DCG Systems GmbH Am Weichselgarten 7 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Meinhardt-Wildegger, Raiko c/o DCG Systems GmbH Am Weichselgarten 7 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Altmann, Frank Saalestraße 1 06118 Halle / DE | 04 /
Naumann, Falk Otto-Kilian-Straße 57 06160 Halle / DE | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Puschmann Borchert Kaiser Klettner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13181506.0 | 23.08.2013 | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2840387 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/72, G01R31/309 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G01N25/72 (EP,US);
G01J5/0066 (US);
G01J5/0096 (US);
G01J5/10 (US);
G01R31/309 (US);
G01R31/311 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lock-in Thermographie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Lokalisierung von heißen Punkten | [2015/09] | English: | Lock-in thermography method and system for hot spot localization | [2015/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de thermographie lock-in pour localiser des points chauds | [2015/09] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 14.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2014 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6812468 (BAUMANN JOACHIM [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, lines 18-32; figures 1, 2 *; | [YD]WO2011156527 (DCG SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0057]; figures 4-8, 11A, 11B *; | [Y] - Fernando Lopez Rodriguez ET AL, "NON-DESTRUCTIVE EVALUATION OF COMPOSITES MATERIALS BY PULSED-PHASE THERMOGRAPHY: DEPTH INVERSION", Proceedings of COBEM 2011, (20111028), pages 1 - 11, URL: http://emc.ufsc.br/labtermo/publica/ac19_COB25761_2011 TIR.pdf, (20131003), XP055082429 [Y] 1-15 * Introduction, 2.2 Principles of Pulsed Phase Thermography, 2.3 Data acquisition and processing in PPT;; figures 1,2,7,8 * | [YD] - CHRISTIAN SCHMIDT ET AL, "Non-destructive defect depth determination at fully packaged and stacked die devices using Lock-in Thermography", PHYSICAL AND FAILURE ANALYSIS OF INTEGRATED CIRCUITS (IPFA), 2010 17TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON THE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100705), ISBN 978-1-4244-5596-6, pages 1 - 5, XP031720074 [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - MALDAGUE X ET AL, "PULSE PHASE INFRARED THERMOGRAPHY", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19960301), vol. 79, no. 5, doi:10.1063/1.362662, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 2694 - 2698, XP000593846 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.362662 |