EP2687608 - Methods for the identification, assessment, and treatment of patients with cancer therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bryant, Barbara 116 Henry Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
Damokosh, Andrew 115 Waterside Lane West Hartford, CT 06107 / US | 03 /
Mulligan, George 32 Taft Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2017/06] |
Former [2014/04] | 01 /
Bryant, Barbara 116 Henry Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02139 / US | ||
02 /
Damokosh, Andrew 115 Waterside Lane West Hartford, CT Connecticut 06107 / US | |||
03 /
Mulligan, George 32 Taft Avenue Lexington, MA Massachusetts 02421 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Taylor, Kate Laura HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2014/04] | Taylor, Kate Laura Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13181515.1 | 08.06.2006 | [2014/04] | Priority number, date | US20050688634P | 08.06.2005 Original published format: US 688634 P | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2687608 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2687608 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
A61K31/69 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
G01N33/57407 (EP,US);
G01N33/57415 (EP,US);
G01N33/57419 (EP,US);
G01N33/57423 (EP,US);
G01N33/57426 (US);
G01N33/57434 (EP,US);
G01N33/57438 (EP,US);
G01N33/57449 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (US);
G16B25/00 (EP,US);
G16B25/10 (EP,US);
G16B40/10 (EP,US);
G16H10/40 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | RS | 23.08.2013 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Identifikation, Beurteilung und Behandlung von Patienten mit Krebstherapie | [2014/04] | English: | Methods for the identification, assessment, and treatment of patients with cancer therapy | [2014/04] | French: | Procédés pour l'identification, l'évaluation et le traitement de patients suivant une cancérothérapie | [2014/04] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06784710.3 / EP1899486 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060784710) is 24.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2006 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | CZ | 08.02.2017 | DK | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MC | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | PL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | SE | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IE | 08.06.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | LU | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.06.2006 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
IE | 08.06.2017 | ||
LU | 08.06.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.06.2006 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
IE | 08.06.2017 | ||
LU | 08.06.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.06.2006 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
IE | 08.06.2017 | ||
LU | 08.06.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 08.06.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2004053066 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * abstract * * page 59, paragraph 5 - page 66, paragraph 2; claims 1-26 * * page 69, paragraph 4; tables 1,2 * * page 22, paragraph 3 * * page 60 - page 61; table B *; | [XA] - BOHEN SEAN P ET AL, "Variation in gene expression patterns in follicular lymphoma and the response to rituximab", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES - PNAS, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, vol. 100, no. 4, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0437875100, ISSN 0027-8424, (20030218), pages 1926 - 1930, (20030205), XP002595370 [X] 16 * abstract * [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0437875100 | [IA] - B. BARLOGIE, "Treatment of multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (20040101), vol. 103, no. 1, doi:10.1182/blood-2003-04-1045, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 20 - 32, XP055040377 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 24, column 2, paragraph 3 * [A] 16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-04-1045 | [A] - BARLOW WILLIAM ET AL, "Predicting event-free and overall survival after treatment of myeloma with the proteasome inhibitor Bortezomib with pre-treatment and 48-hour post-therapy gene expression patterns", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20041101), vol. 104, no. 11, Part 1, ISSN 0006-4971, page 414A, XP009129472 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |