EP2704057 - Gesture recognition apparatus, control method thereof, display instrument, and computer readable medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Takayoshi c/o Omron Corporation Shiokoji Horikawa, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto, 600-8530 / JP | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13181706.6 | 26.08.2013 | [2014/10] | Priority number, date | JP20120192039 | 31.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012192039 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2704057 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2704057 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/32 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
G06V40/28 (EP,US);
G06T7/20 (KR);
G06F3/017 (US);
G06T7/00 (KR);
G06V10/245 (EP,US);
G06V10/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/10] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2014/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gestenerkennungsvorrichtung, Steuerverfahren dafür, Anzeigeinstrument und computerlesbares Medium | [2014/10] | English: | Gesture recognition apparatus, control method thereof, display instrument, and computer readable medium | [2014/10] | French: | Appareil de reconnaissance de geste, son procédé de commande, instrument d'affichage et support lisible par ordinateur | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003216955 (SHARP KK)[A] 1; | [X]EP2463751 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract and §0087-0092 *; | [XI] - XIYING WANG ET AL, "Tracking of deformable human hand in real time as continuous input for gesture-based interaction", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT USER INTERFACES , IUI '07, New York, New York, USA, (20070101), doi:10.1145/1216295.1216338, ISBN 978-1-59-593481-9, page 235, XP055153775 [X] 1 * pages 237,239; figures 1,7; table 1 * [I] 2-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1216295.1216338 | [X] - XIANG S ET AL, "Contour graph based human tracking and action sequence recognition", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, vol. 41, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.PATCOG.2008.05.016, ISSN 0031-3203, (20081201), pages 3653 - 3664, (20080522), XP023977329 [X] 1 * abstract and §5.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patcog.2008.05.016 | [X] - MARKUS SCHLATTMANN ET AL, "Markerless 4 gestures 6 DOF real-time visual tracking of the human hand with automatic initialization", COMPUTER GRAPHICS FORUM, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20071012), vol. 26, no. 3, doi:10.1111/J.1467-8659.2007.01069.X, ISSN 0167-7055, page 467, XP007906060 [X] 1 * §4-§5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1467-8659.2007.01069.x | by applicant | WO03025859 | JP2003216955 |