EP2704061 - Apparatus and method for recognizing a character in terminal equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.10.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jang, Sihak C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Seonhwa C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Heejin C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Mijung C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2014/10] | Application number, filing date | 13181727.2 | 26.08.2013 | [2014/10] | Priority number, date | KR20120093561 | 27.08.2012 Original published format: KR 20120093561 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2704061 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2704061 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/32, G06K9/03, G06K9/22 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
G06V30/1456 (EP,US);
G06F3/0487 (KR);
G06F1/1684 (KR);
G06F1/1686 (KR);
G06F3/01 (EP,US);
G06F3/0233 (KR);
G06F3/0481 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (KR);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06V20/635 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2014/10] | G06K9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2014/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erkennung eines Zeichens in einer Endgerätausrüstung | [2014/10] | English: | Apparatus and method for recognizing a character in terminal equipment | [2014/10] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour reconnaître un caractère dans un équipement de terminal | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.10.2018 | 04.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/09] | 20.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003169924 (NISHIYAMA KYOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1,6-9,14,15 * figure 38 ** figure 45-49, paragraphs 316-322 *; | [YA]US2005286493 (ANGELHAG ANDERS [SE]) [Y] 5 * figure 3 * * paragraphs 31 and 32 * [A] 1,6-8; | [YA]US2006119901 (EHRENFELD FERI [IL], et al) [Y] 2-5,10-13 * figure 3 A-B, paragraphs 15-17 * [A] 6-8,14,15; | [A]EP2136317 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,6-9,14,15 * paragraph 31 and 40 *; | [A]US2010329555 (CHAPMAN PETER [US], et al) [A] 6-8,14,15 * paragraph 44, 45 and figure 9 *; | [XAY] - IntSig, "CamDictionary", (20110825), URL: https://play.google.com/store/apps/details?id=com.intsig.license.camdict, (20141208), XP002733534 [X] 1,9 * figure 1, 2 and 3 * [A] 6-8,14,15 [Y] 2-5,10-13 | [YA] - Anonymous, "Point, tap, brush and listen", (20120809), page 3pp, Google translate blog, URL: http://googletranslate.blogspot.nl/2012/08/point-tap-brush-and-listen.html, (20141209), XP002733535 [Y] 5,13 * figure 2, 3 and 4 * [A] 1,6-8 | [A] - Kevin Purdy, "CamCard Captures and Transcribes Business Cards from iPhone and Android", (20110318), URL: http://lifehacker.com/5783256/camcard-captures-and-saves-business-cards-to-your-contacts, (20141209), XP002733536 [A] 1,6-9,14,15 * figure 1 * |