EP2672209 - Household refrigerating appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Via Carlo Pisacane nº 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | For all designated states Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A Via Carlo Pisacane nº 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states Indesit Company S.p.A. Viale Aristide Merloni, 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cappelletti, Domenico Via G. Brodolini, 27 62024 Matelica (MC) / IT | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Guerci, Alessandro, et al Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Santonicola, Paolo Indesit Company S.p.A. Industrial Property Management Team Via Lamberto Corsi, 55 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | Application number, filing date | 13183244.6 | 26.02.2009 | [2013/50] | Priority number, date | IT2008TO00027U | 05.03.2008 Original published format: IT TO20080027 U | [2013/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2672209 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/02, E05D11/10, E05F1/12 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
E05F1/1284 (EP);
E05D11/105 (EP);
E05D11/1078 (EP);
F25D23/028 (EP);
E05Y2800/21 (EP);
E05Y2800/262 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | Haushaltskühlschrank | [2013/50] | English: | Household refrigerating appliance | [2013/50] | French: | Appareil domestique de réfrigération | [2013/50] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09717531.9 / EP2247903 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN1888364 ; | [A]KR20030078137 (HOIL PREC CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 3,4,5 *; | [Y]US7008032 (CHEKAL RAYMOND J [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1,5,6 *; | [Y]WO2006036044 (I ONE INNOTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 20-27; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 39, Database accession no. 2007-404658, XP002539101 & CN1888364 A 20070103 (LEJIN ELECTRONIC TIANJIN ELEC APPLIANCE) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | US7008032 | IT2007RN00056 | IT2007TO00911 |