EP2674984 - Nanostructured Light Emitting Diode Device Manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states European Nano Invest Ab Adolf Fredriksgatan 3 217 74 Malmö / SE | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaiwook, Rizgar Skräddarebyn 4B, 4tr S-218 42 Bunkeflostrand / SE | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/15] |
Former [2013/51] | Stein, Jan Ipracraft AB P.O. Box 24166 104 51 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13183768.4 | 09.03.2011 | [2013/51] | Priority number, date | US20100311811P | 09.03.2010 Original published format: US 311811 P | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2674984 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0216, H01L31/0236, H01L31/0352, H01L31/052, H01L31/055, H01L33/50, H01L33/06, H01L33/22, H01L33/40 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
H01L31/02168 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/02363 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/035218 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/055 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/056 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/04 (KR);
H01L33/22 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/405 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/502 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Herstellung einer nanostrukturierten lichtemittierenden Diodenvorrichtung | [2013/51] | English: | Nanostructured Light Emitting Diode Device Manufacturing | [2013/51] | French: | Fabrication de dispositif de diode électroluminescente nano-structurée | [2013/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/11] | 12.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/11] | Public notification(s) | Noting of loss or fights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC. EPO Form 1097 dated 05.10.14 | European Nano Invest Ab Adolf Fredriksgatan 3 217 74 Malmö / SE | [2014/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11708791.6 / EP2545589 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007085100 (DIANA FREDERIC S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] - [0018] - [0021] - [0026] - [0038] , [0041] , [0048] , [0053] , [0054] , [0058] , [0066] , [0070] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0079] - [0088] - [0106] * [I] 4,9,10; | [I]US2004041164 (THIBEAULT BRIAN [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0013] , [0017] - [0022] - [0043] , [0045] , [0046] , [0057] - [0061] - [0065] - [0067] - [0070] , [0074] , [0076] , [0084] *; | [A]US2005253152 (KLIMOV VICTOR I [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007] - [0011] - [0014] , [0015] , [0018] - [0022] - [0026] *; | [A]US2009079034 (WANG WANG NANG [GB]) [A] 1,4,5,7-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - HUANG H W ET AL, "Enhanced light output power of GaN-based vertical-injection light-emitting diodes with a 12-fold photonic quasi-crystal by nano-imprint lithography; Enhanced light output power of GaN-based VLEDs with a 12-fold PQC by NIL", SEMICONDUCTOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20090703), vol. 24, no. 8, doi:10.1088/0268-1242/24/8/085008, ISSN 0268-1242, page 85008, XP020159514 [A] 1,4,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0268-1242/24/8/085008 | [A] - YU ZHAO ET AL, "A numerical study of the emission enhancement of light emitting diodes with an interfacial photonic crystal resonance reflector; A numerical study of the emission enhancement of LEDs with an interfacial photonic crystal resonance reflector", SEMICONDUCTOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20090415), vol. 24, no. 5, doi:10.1088/0268-1242/24/5/055013, ISSN 0268-1242, page 55013, XP020150907 [A] 1,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0268-1242/24/5/055013 | by applicant | WO2008137995 | US2008216894 | US2009255580 | US2008130120 | - CHANYAWADEE, S. ET AL., APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2009), vol. 94, page 233502 | - PV CONFERENCE 2000, 28TH IEEE CONF., (2000), pages 818 - 821 |