EP2706234 - Air ducting shroud for cooling an air compressor pump and motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US | [2024/08] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, Gary D. 587 North Main Street Medina, TN Tennessee 38355 / US | 02 /
Craig, Scott D. 54 Wood Duck Cove Jackson, TN Tennessee 38305 / US | 03 /
Wilson, Christina 111 Woods Edge Drive Jackson, TN Tennessee 38301 / US | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [2024/09] |
Former [2014/11] | Stentiford, Andrew Charles, et al Black and Decker 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13183932.6 | 11.09.2013 | [2014/11] | Priority number, date | US201213609331 | 11.09.2012 Original published format: US201213609331 | US201213609343 | 11.09.2012 Original published format: US201213609343 | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2706234 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2706234 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00, F04B39/12, F04B41/02 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
F04B39/0027 (EP);
F04B39/0055 (EP);
F04B39/0061 (EP);
F04B39/121 (EP);
F04B41/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] |
Former [2014/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Luftleitungsummantelung zum Kühlen einer Luftkompressorpumpe und Motor | [2014/11] | English: | Air ducting shroud for cooling an air compressor pump and motor | [2014/11] | French: | Carénage de refroidissement d'une pompe à compression d'air et moteur | [2014/11] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 20.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2020 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 15.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US1381056 (MATHEW BLAKELY RICHARD) [I] 1-13 * figures 1-3; claim 5 *; | [I]JP2003065241 (PILOT INK CO LTD) [I] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2008021251 (EXNER MARK [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0056] , [0062] , [0063] , [0085] , [0087] *; | [A]EP2320085 (TECHTRONIC POWER TOOLS TECH [VG]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018] * | Examination | US7189068 |