EP2711779 - Image heating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/34] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Takuya c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/13] | Application number, filing date | 13184316.1 | 13.09.2013 | [2014/13] | Priority number, date | JP20120210919 | 25.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012210919 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2711779 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2711779 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2711779 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
G03G15/2017 (EP,US);
G03G15/2053 (US);
G03G2215/2019 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2014/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bilderwärmungsvorrichtung | [2014/13] | English: | Image heating apparatus | [2014/13] | French: | Appareil de chauffage d'images | [2014/13] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 11.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2020 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2013 | AL | 19.08.2020 | AT | 19.08.2020 | CY | 19.08.2020 | CZ | 19.08.2020 | DK | 19.08.2020 | EE | 19.08.2020 | ES | 19.08.2020 | FI | 19.08.2020 | HR | 19.08.2020 | IT | 19.08.2020 | LT | 19.08.2020 | LV | 19.08.2020 | MC | 19.08.2020 | MK | 19.08.2020 | MT | 19.08.2020 | NL | 19.08.2020 | PL | 19.08.2020 | RO | 19.08.2020 | RS | 19.08.2020 | SE | 19.08.2020 | SI | 19.08.2020 | SK | 19.08.2020 | SM | 19.08.2020 | TR | 19.08.2020 | IE | 13.09.2020 | LU | 13.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | FR | 19.10.2020 | BG | 19.11.2020 | NO | 19.11.2020 | GR | 20.11.2020 | IS | 19.12.2020 | PT | 21.12.2020 | DE | 01.04.2021 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.09.2013 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MT | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
TR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IE | 13.09.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 19.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
TR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IE | 13.09.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 19.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
IE | 13.09.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 19.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 19.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
FR | 19.10.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 19.08.2020 | |
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7711306 (KAGAWA TOSHIAKI [JP]) [X] 1-15 * column 7, lines 38-48; figures 1,6a,7 * * column 12, lines 45-53 *; | [XD]JP2010134072 (KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECH) [XD] 1-15* figures 1,3 * | by applicant | JP2005316421 | JP2010134072 |