EP2709018 - Method of managing main memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shin, Hee-Sub, Shin, Hee-Sub c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2014/12] | Application number, filing date | 13184317.9 | 13.09.2013 | [2014/12] | Priority number, date | KR20120101456 | 13.09.2012 Original published format: KR 20120101456 | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2709018 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08, G06F12/12 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
G06F12/08 (EP,US);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G06F12/126 (US);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F12/0804 (US);
G06F12/123 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwaltung eines Hauptspeichers | [2014/12] | English: | Method of managing main memory | [2014/12] | French: | Procédé de gestion de mémoire principale | [2014/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 27.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2004030847 (TREMAINE ROBERT B [US]) [X] 1,9-12,15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0016] - [0033] , [0037] , [0038] , [0 43] , [0044] * [A] 5 [Y] 2-4,6 [I] 7,8; | [Y]US7587572 (STENSTROM PER O [SE]) [Y] 2-4,6 * column 5, lines 55-67 * * column 7, line 2 - column 8, line 53 *; | [A]US2007088920 (GARCIA PHILIP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] - [0020] * |