EP2711822 - Method for determining three-dimensional visual effect on information element using apparatus with touch sensitive display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ixonos OYJ Hitsaajankatu 24 00810 Helsinki / FI | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kainiemi, Pasi Virrenkatu 5 b 10 33800 Tampere / FI | 02 /
Kainiemi, Petri Sorsankuja 2 37630 Valkeakoski / FI | 03 /
Paihonen, Sami 18789 McFarland Avenue Saratoga, CA California 95070 / US | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2014/13] | Application number, filing date | 13184664.4 | 17.09.2013 | [2014/13] | Priority number, date | US201213622307 | 18.09.2012 Original published format: US201213622307 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2711822 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2711822 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0483, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0488, G06F9/44 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
G06F3/0483 (EP,US);
G06T15/00 (US);
G06F3/04845 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/13] | G06F3/0483, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0488 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines dreidimensionalen visuellen Effekt auf einem Informationselement unter Verwendung einer Vorrichtung mit berührungsempfindlicher Anzeige | [2014/13] | English: | Method for determining three-dimensional visual effect on information element using apparatus with touch sensitive display | [2014/13] | French: | Procédé de détermination d'effet visuel tridimensionnel sur un élément d'informations utilisant un appareil avec affichage tactile | [2014/13] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5463725 (HENCKEL JONATHAN D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-15 * column 1, lines 49-57 * * column 2, line 13 - column 6, line 67; figures 1-6 * [I] 3; | [XI]US2009102805 (MEIJER ERIK [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 26] , [0030] - [0035] - [0054] , [0057] , [0060] , [0062] - [0065]; figures 1-5, 7C,9-11 *[I] 4,13; | [XI]US2012084647 (HOMMA FUMINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-15 * the whole document * [I] 3 |