EP2848764 - Downhole wireline cleaning tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welltec A/S Gydevang 25 3450 Allerød / DK | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jensen, Sven Karsten Skovvangs Allé 7 3660 Stenløse / DK | 02 /
Born, Rune Garbers Hanne Nielsens Vej 7 2840 Holte / DK | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Dragsted Partners A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Hoffmann Dragsted A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 13184806.1 | 17.09.2013 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2848764 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E21B37/02, E21B10/32, E21B4/04 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
E21B37/02 (EP,RU,US);
E21B4/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bohrloch-Drahtleitungsreinigungswerkzeug | [2015/12] | English: | Downhole wireline cleaning tool | [2015/12] | French: | Outil de nettoyage de câble de fond de trou | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2013 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 19.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03010410 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2010054407 (WEATHERFORD LAMB [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [ 0119]; figures 1A, 1B, 9 *; | [Y]US2011005836 (RADFORD STEVEN R [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraph [0094]; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP2530238 (WELLTEC AS [DK]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [ 0036] , [ 0040]; figures 1-4 * |