EP2712849 - A flat glass application with low iron content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Türkiye Sise Ve Cam Fabrikalari A.S. Icmeler Mahallesi D-100 Karayolu Caddesi No:44A 34947 Tuzla / TR | [2017/41] |
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states Türkiye Sise Ve Cam Fabrikalari A.S. Is Kuleleri Kule 3 4. Levent 34330 Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akmaz, Fehiman TURKIYE SISE VE CAM FABRIKALARI A.S. IS KULELERI KULE-3 34330 4.LEVENT ISTANBUL/TURKIYE 34330 ISTANBUL / TR | 02 /
Sesigur, Hande TURKIYE SISE VE CAM FABRIKALARI A.S. IS KULELERI KULE-3 34330 4.LEVENT ISTANBUL/TURKIYE 34330 ISTANBUL / TR | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Kaya, Erdem, et al Erdem Kaya Patent Inc. Konak Mahallesi Kudret Sk. Elitpark Park Sit. Ofisler Apt. No: 12/27 16110 Nilüfer/Bursa / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Kaya, Erdem, et al Erdem Kaya Patent Inc. Konak Mah. Kudret Sok. Senyurt Is Merkezi No. 6 Daire: 8 16110 Nilüfer/Bursa / TR | ||
Former [2014/14] | Kaya, Erdem Bilen Patent Inc. Hudavendigar Mh. Bent Cad. No. 163/B, Osmangazi 16090 Bursa / TR | Application number, filing date | 13186168.4 | 26.09.2013 | [2014/14] | Priority number, date | TR20120011070 | 28.09.2012 Original published format: TR 201211070 | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712849 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/087, C03C4/00 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
C03C3/087 (EP);
C03C4/0092 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Title | German: | Flache Glasanwendung mit geringem Eisengehalt | [2014/14] | English: | A flat glass application with low iron content | [2014/14] | French: | Application de verre plat à faible teneur en fer | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 14.11.2014 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 02.12.2014 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 07.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1116699 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * claim 1 * * examples 1-2,14,21-22 *; | [X]EP1281687 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * claim 1 * * examples 8-10,14-18 *; | [X]EP1291330 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * claim 3 ** examples 1-12,14-18 *; | [X]WO2008096876 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * claim 5 * * examples 1-11 *; | [X]US2010126218 (SHELESTAK LARRY J [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0019] * * Batches A, B and C;; table 5 * | by applicant | EP1480917 | CA2744380 | US2010152014 | EP2261183 |