EP2724711 - Hair care product with selected amino acids and/or selected oligopeptides and a selected cationic keratin hydrolysate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krueger, Marcus Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Thiensener Weg 13 25373 Ellerhoop / DE | [2014/18] | Application number, filing date | 13186329.2 | 27.09.2013 | [2014/18] | Priority number, date | DE201210219585 | 25.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012219585 | [2014/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2724711 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2724711 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/41, A61K8/44, A61Q5/00, A61Q5/12, A61K8/65 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (US);
A61K8/442 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61K8/65 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Haarpflegemittel mit ausgewählten Aminosäuren und/oder ausgewählten Oligopeptiden und einem ausgewählten kationischen Keratinhydrolysat | [2014/18] | English: | Hair care product with selected amino acids and/or selected oligopeptides and a selected cationic keratin hydrolysate | [2014/18] | French: | Produit de soin capillaire comprenant des acides aminés sélectionnés et/ou des oligopeptides sélectionnés et un hydrolysat de kératine cationique sélectionné | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/21] | 21.01.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4690818 (PUCHALSKI JR EUGENE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * examples 1,2 *; | [X]EP0704200 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-10 * examples 1,3-6 *; | [X]EP1813259 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-10 * Ansprüche; paragraph [0007] *; | [X]DE102010039535 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-10 * examples 3-6,11,12 *; | [X]EP2422763 (COLOMER BEAUTY AND PROFESSIONAL PRODUCTS S L [ES]) [X] 1-10 * Ansprüche, Beispiele; paragraphs [0003] , [0004] *; | [X]WO2012084336 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * Ansprüche , Beispiele; page 1, paragraph 2 *; | [X]DE102011089357 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-10 * Beispiele *; | [X] - "Volumising shampoo", GNPD, MINTEL, (200609), Database accession no. 587137, XP002716747 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - "Conditioner", GNPD, MINTEL, (200812), Database accession no. 1010446, XP002716748 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - "Silkening 2-Phase Treatment", GNPD, MINTEL, (201110), Database accession no. 1637965, XP002716749 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * |