EP2853334 - Method of joining a plate heat exchanger using a melting depressant layer ; corresponding heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/14] | Method of joining a plate heat exchanger using a melting depressant layer | ||
[2017/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfa Laval Corporate AB P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [2017/27] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Alfa Laval Corporate AB Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sjödin, Per Östra Vallgatan 37 A 223 61 Lund / SE | 02 /
Walter, Kristian Lyngby 221 247 99 Genarp / SE | [2017/43] |
Former [2015/14] | 01 /
Sjödin, Per Östra Vallgatan 37 A SE-223 61 Lund / SE | ||
02 /
Walter, Kristian Lyngby 221 247 99 Genarp / SE | Representative(s) | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Group Patent P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Patent Department P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 13186388.8 | 27.09.2013 | [2015/14] | Priority number, date | EP20130186257 | 26.09.2013 Original published format: EP 13186257 | [2015/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2853334 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2853334 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K1/19, B23K1/20, B23K20/02, B23K20/16, F28F3/02, F28D9/00, B23K1/008, B23K35/365, B23K35/00 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
B23K1/0012 (EP,KR,US);
F28F21/081 (US);
B23K1/008 (EP,KR,US);
B23K1/19 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B23K1/20 (EP,KR,US);
B23K1/203 (US);
B23K20/023 (EP,KR,US);
B23K20/16 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/001 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/004 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/0222 (EP,US);
B23K35/025 (EP,US);
B23K35/3033 (EP,US);
B23K35/3053 (EP,US);
B23K35/3601 (EP,US);
B23K35/3612 (EP,US);
B23K35/365 (EP,US);
B23P15/26 (KR);
C22C19/03 (EP,US);
C22C19/056 (EP,US);
C22C19/058 (EP,US);
C22C19/07 (EP,US);
C22C38/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/18 (EP,US);
C22C38/40 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,US);
C22C9/00 (EP,US);
F28D9/0037 (US);
F28F21/082 (US);
F28F21/087 (US);
F28F3/025 (EP,KR,US);
B21D53/04 (RU);
B23K1/00 (RU);
B23K2101/14 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/30 (RU);
F28F2275/045 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbindung eines aus Platten hergestellten Wärmeaustauscher unter Verwendung einer schmelzniedrigerzeugenden Schicht ; entsprechender Wärmeaustauscher | [2017/28] | English: | Method of joining a plate heat exchanger using a melting depressant layer ; corresponding heat exchanger | [2017/25] | French: | Procédé d'assemblage d'un échangeur de chaleur constitué de plaques utilisant une couche de matériau abaissant la température de fusion ; échangeur de chaleur correspondant | [2017/28] |
Former [2015/14] | Verfahren zur Verbindung eines aus Platten hergestellten Wärmeaustauschers unter Verwendung einer schmelzniedrigerzeugenden Schicht | ||
Former [2015/14] | Method of joining a plate heat exchanger using a melting depressant layer | ||
Former [2015/14] | Procédé d'assemblage d'un échangeur de chaleur constitué de plaques utilisant une couche de matériau abaissant la temperature de fusion | Examination procedure | 13.03.2014 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2013 | AL | 25.10.2017 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 25.10.2017 | |
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2006060296 (SIGLER DAVID R [US], et al) [Y] 2-6 * paragraph [0036]; figure - * [A] 7,8; | [Y]US2009305078 (SJODIN PER [SE]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0008] , [0020]; figure - *; | [A]US2012183807 (PERSSON ULRIKA [SE]) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0032] - [0033] - [0041]; figure - *; | [E]WO2013144251 (ALFA LAVAL CORP AB [SE]) [E] 1-22 * abstract *; | [XY] - RASSMUS J ET AL, "Joining aspects on large plate heat exchangers in stainless steel", INTERNATIONAL AWS WRC BRAZING AND SOLDERING CONFERENCE. ABSTRACTS OF PAPERS, XX, XX, (20060424), no. ED.3, pages 357 - 362, XP003028289 [X] 21,22 * the whole document * [Y] 1-20 |