EP2724710 - Hair care composition comprising cationic alkyl polyglycosides and polyglycerol esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Von Aspern, Edith Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Langenstücken 7B 21271 Hanstedt / DE | 02 /
Krueger, Marcus Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Thiensener Weg 13 25373 Ellerhoop / DE | 03 /
Mette, Manuela Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Dorfstr. 10 D 23923 Kleinfeld / DE | 04 /
Bode, Katharina Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Mushardweg 8 21614 Buxtehude / DE | [2014/18] | Application number, filing date | 13186424.1 | 27.09.2013 | [2014/18] | Priority number, date | DE201210219588 | 25.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012219588 | [2014/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2724710 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2724710 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/39, A61Q5/00, A61K8/60 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
A61K8/604 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61Q5/002 (EP,US);
A61Q5/004 (EP,US);
A61Q5/006 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Haarpflegemittel mit kationischen Alkyloligoglucosiden und Polyglycerinestern | [2014/18] | English: | Hair care composition comprising cationic alkyl polyglycosides and polyglycerol esters | [2014/18] | French: | Produit de soin capillaire comprenant des alkyloligoglucosides cationiques et des esters de polyglycérine | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/48] | 21.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5298240 (SCHROEDER FRIEDEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 33 - line 41; examples 11-13 *; | [A]DE102011089357 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-10 * Beispiele;; claim 1 *; | [X]JP2008308415 (LION CORP) [X] 1-10 * Ansprüche, Beispiele * | [X] - "Powder Make UP", GNPD, MINTEL, (20090301), Database accession no. 1058442, XP002722785 [X] 1,5,8 * the whole document * | [A] - "Poly Suga Quat Seriws. Natural, Green Conditioning Surfactants", INTERNET CITATION, (20100202), pages 1 - 4, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20100202193937/http://www.greenstarproducts.org/documents/pdfs/POLY%20SUGAQUAT%20BULLETIN.pdf, (20140404), XP007922616 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | Examination | EP2468842 |