EP2716548 - Nose of a flying vehicle and associated flying vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dassault Aviation 9 Rond Point des Champs Elysées - Marcel Dassault 75008 Paris / FR | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouffanais, Fabien 6 rue Paul Girondeau 92290 CHATENAY-MALABRY / FR | 02 /
De Maqueville, Benoît 135 bis Chemin de Labry 33240 SAINT ANDRE DE CUBZAC / FR | 03 /
Gavouyere, Olivier 13 rue des Abondances 92100 BOULOGNE-BILLANCOURT / FR | 04 /
Johan, Zdenek 2 rue de la Rangée 92380 GARCHES / FR | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2018/32] |
Former [2014/15] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13186493.6 | 27.09.2013 | [2014/15] | Priority number, date | FR20120002673 | 05.10.2012 Original published format: FR 1202673 | [2014/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716548 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2716548 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B64D47/08, B64C1/14 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
B64C1/1492 (EP,US);
B64C1/1484 (US);
B64D47/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2014/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Rumpfnase eines Fluggeräts, und entsprechendes Fluggerät | [2014/15] | English: | Nose of a flying vehicle and associated flying vehicle | [2014/15] | French: | Pointe avant d'engin volant et engin volant associé | [2014/15] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 09.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2013 | AL | 08.08.2018 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | MT | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | PT | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | IE | 27.09.2018 | LU | 27.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | GB | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | DE | 02.04.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
MT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
MT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
MT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.09.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 27.09.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0511154 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,11,13 * column 10, lines 5-20; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0653887 (PURITAN BENNETT CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,9,11,13 * column 6, lines 25-36; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6056237 (WOODLAND RICHARD L K [CA]) [X] 1,2,13* column 7, lines 51-56; figure 5 *; | [X]US2005099433 (BERSON BARRY L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,11-13 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2006016940 (MORGAN SCOTT E [US]) [X] 1-3,8,13 * paragraph [0036]; figure 1 *; | [XI]FR2890643 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,13 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 23 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 11 |