EP2717080 - Reconfigurable fiber optic cable assemblies and optical connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Cable Systems LLC 800 17th Street NW Hickory NC 28601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states Corning Cable Systems LLC 800 17th Street NW Hickory NC 28602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isenhour, Micah Colen 1008 Park Circle Lincolnton, NC North Carolina 28092 / US | 02 /
Knecht, Dennis Michael 4921 Elmhurst Drive Hickory, NC North Carolina 28601 / US | 03 /
Luther, James Phillip 2471 Rolling Ridge Drive Hickory, NC North Carolina 28602 / US | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Sturm, Christoph Quermann Sturm Weilnau Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 13187025.5 | 02.10.2013 | [2014/15] | Priority number, date | US201261710308P | 05.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261710308 P | US201313790792 | 08.03.2013 Original published format: US201313790792 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2717080 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
G02B6/3887 (EP,US);
G02B6/3829 (EP);
G02B6/4204 (US);
G02B6/3821 (EP,US);
G02B6/3885 (EP,US);
G02B6/4214 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rekonfigurierbare Glasfaserkabelanordnungen und optische Stecker | [2014/15] | English: | Reconfigurable fiber optic cable assemblies and optical connectors | [2014/15] | French: | Ensembles de câbles à fibres optiques reconfigurables et connecteurs optiques | [2014/15] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 14.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |