EP2717333 - Encapsulating sheet-covered semiconductor element, producing method thereof, semiconductor device, and producing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katayama, Hiroyuki c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Takashi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
Ebe, Yuki c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
Mitani, Munehisa c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | 05 /
Ooyabu, Yasunari c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13187076.8 | 02.10.2013 | [2014/15] | Priority number, date | JP20120221655 | 03.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012221655 | JP20130176712 | 28.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013176712 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2717333 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L33/54 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
B32B3/08 (EP,US);
H01L33/52 (KR,US);
H01L33/0095 (EP,CN,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/06 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/283 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B3/26 (EP,US);
B32B3/266 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
H01L33/44 (US);
H01L33/48 (KR);
H01L33/502 (US);
H01L33/54 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2264/0214 (EP,US);
B32B2264/10 (EP,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US);
B32B2457/00 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verkapselungsüberzogenes Halbleiterelement, Herstellungsverfahren dafür, Halbleitervorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2014/15] | English: | Encapsulating sheet-covered semiconductor element, producing method thereof, semiconductor device, and producing method thereof | [2014/15] | French: | Élément semi-conducteur recouvert d'une feuille d'encapsulation, son procédé de production et procédé de production associé | [2014/15] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 15.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2001308116 | JP2005286003 | - D.A. DE VEKKI, "Hydrosilylation on Photoactivated Catalysts", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF GENERAL CHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 81, no. 7, pages 1480 - 1492 |