EP2687719 - Rotor blade, rotor blade element and production method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Borsigstrasse 26 26607 Aurich / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Dreekamp 5 26605 Aurich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muschke, Sven Bahnweg 46 26419 Schortens / DE | 02 /
Link, Torsten Wurzeldeich 60 26506 Norden / DE | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2014/04] | Application number, filing date | 13187135.2 | 13.04.2010 | [2014/04] | Priority number, date | DE20091002501 | 20.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009002501 | [2014/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2687719 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2687719 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06, B29C70/44 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
B29C70/086 (EP,US);
F03D1/06 (KR);
B29C70/44 (KR);
B29C70/443 (EP,US);
B29D99/0028 (EP,US);
B29L2031/082 (EP,US);
B29L2031/085 (EP);
F05B2230/90 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2014/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Rotorblatt, Rotorblattelement und Herstellverfahren | [2014/04] | English: | Rotor blade, rotor blade element and production method | [2014/04] | French: | Pale de rotor, élément de pale de rotor et procédé de fabrication | [2014/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2016 | 06.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10713644.2 / EP2422077 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2010 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | MT | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 13.04.2010 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1625929 (STRUCTURAL POLYMER SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraphs [0062] , [0088] , [0111] *; | [X]WO2006066593 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-12* page 3, line 6 - page 6, line 28 * | by applicant | DE10319246 | DE10344379 | DE102004007487 | DE102006051897 |