EP2860932 - Multimedia Communications Service Handling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stille, Mats Ola Radhusallén 11 167 54 Bromma / SE | 02 /
Widebrant, Anders Pedellgatan 1M 224 60 LUND / SE | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2015/16] | Application number, filing date | 13187894.4 | 09.10.2013 | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2860932 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L65/1096 (US);
H04L65/1059 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1076 (US);
H04L65/1093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Multimediakommunikationsdienstbehandlung | [2015/16] | English: | Multimedia Communications Service Handling | [2015/16] | French: | Gestion de service de communications multimédia | [2015/16] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7123707 (HIRI FARZAD [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 13; figures 1A - 1E *; | [A]EP2230814 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1 - 7 * | by applicant | - 3GPP TS 24.229 | - "GSM Association Official Document IR. 92 - IMS Profile for Voice and SMS", GSMA IR, page 92 |