EP2696524 - Mobile station device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/07] | Mobile Station Device | ||
[2016/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2017/17] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naka, Katsuyoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Haga, Hiroki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Matsuo, Hidenori c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/17] |
Former [2014/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13189131.9 | 05.07.2006 | [2014/07] | Priority number, date | JP20050198608 | 07.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005198608 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2696524 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2696524 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04B1/7083, // H04B1/7073 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
H04J11/0069 (EP,US);
H04B1/7083 (EP,US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L27/2656 (EP,US);
H04L27/2675 (EP,US);
H04L5/005 (US);
H04W72/02 (US);
H04B1/70735 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/17] |
Former [2014/07] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Mobilstationsvorrichtung | [2014/07] | English: | Mobile station device | [2016/51] | French: | Dispositif de station mobile | [2014/07] |
Former [2014/07] | Mobile Station Device | Examination procedure | 07.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 18.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06780804.8 / EP1892867 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060780804) is 17.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003072255 (MA JIANGLEI [CA], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0130]; figures 2b,6,7A,7B * * paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0157] *; | [A]EP1337069 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0061]; figures 2,3 ** claims 1-23 *; | [X]US2004085946 (MORITA MINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0029] , [0045] - [0054]; figures 1,2,3,5 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0068] *; | [X]US2004246998 (MA JIANGLEI [CA], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0065] - [0068] - [0122] - [0127]; figures 1,6,9,12 * | by applicant | JP2003244763 |