EP2688266 - Systems and methods for currency querying [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | For all designated states Telcordia Technologies, Inc. 1 Telcordia Drive, Suite 05G0116 Piscataway, NJ 08854-4157 / US | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oba, Toshihiro c/o Toshiba America Research Inc. PO Box 429 Piscataway, NJ New Jersey 08854-4151 / US | 02 /
Cheng, Yuu-Heng Alice 300 N. Randolphville Road Apt. 141 Piscataway, NJ New Jersey 08854 / US | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13189182.2 | 09.04.2008 | [2014/04] | Priority number, date | US20070910820P | 09.04.2007 Original published format: US 910820 P | US20080044978 | 09.03.2008 Original published format: US 44978 | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2688266 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, // H04W12/06, H04W36/14 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
G06Q40/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/16 (KR);
H04W12/06 (KR);
H04W12/062 (EP,US);
H04W36/005 (KR);
H04W4/24 (KR);
H04W36/14 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2014/04] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Währungsabfrage | [2014/04] | English: | Systems and methods for currency querying | [2014/04] | French: | Systèmes et procédés de demande de devises | [2014/04] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 12.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08740468.7 / EP2145500 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080740468) is 07.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007041344 (YAQUB RAZIQ [US], et al); | by applicant | US20060825567 |