EP2732970 - Module structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195 - Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | [2015/26] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195 - Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | ||
For all designated states Kuo Hsin Technology Co., Ltd. 7F-5, 91, Ta Shun 1st Road Kaohsiung 81357 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Wen-Hsien No. 230, Jinxue Rd., Jiali Dist. 722 Tainan City / TW | 02 /
Kuan, Min-Tsung 31, Ln. 37, Wucuo 6th St. Qingshui Dist. 436 Taichung City / TW | 03 /
Lee, Tzong-Ming No.18, Jinshan N. 2nd St. 300 Hsinchu City / TW | 04 /
Chou, Wen-Hsien No.3, Caohu, Lunbei Township 637 Yunlin County / TW | 05 /
Lin, Fu-Ming No.12, Ln. 19, Fugui St. Zhudong Township 310 Hsinchu County / TW | 06 /
Lee, Wen-Kuei No.22, Ln. 180 Zhongzheng Rd. Puyan Township 516 Changhua County / TW | 07 /
Yeh, Chin Zeng No.90., Yuying St. Sanmin Dist. 807 Kaohsiung City / TW | 08 /
Chen, Ming-Hung No.31, Ln. 56, Jianxing Rd. Sanmin Dist. 807 Kaohsiung City / TW | 09 /
Huang, Chung-Teng No.65-1, Shigang St., Shigang Dist. 422 Taichung City / TW | 10 /
Fu, Hsueh Jen 3F., No.43-1, Songjiang St. Fengshan Dist. 830 Kaohsiung City / TW | [2015/26] |
Former [2014/21] | 01 /
Wang, Wen-Hsien No.230, Jinxue Rd., Jiali Township 722 Tainan County / TW | ||
02 /
Kuan, Min-Tsung No.5-8, Aly. 16, Xinxing Ln. Dongshan Rd. Qingshui Township 436 Taichung County / TW | |||
03 /
Lee, Tzong-Ming No.18, Jinshan N. 2nd St. 300 Hsinchu City / TW | |||
04 /
Chou, Wen-Hsien No.3, Caohu, Lunbei Township 637 Yunlin County / TW | |||
05 /
Lin, Fu-Ming No.12, Ln. 19, Fugui St. Zhudong Township 310 Hsinchu County / TW | |||
06 /
Lee, Wen-Kuei No.22, Ln. 180 Zhongzheng Rd. Puyan Township 516 Changhua County / TW | |||
07 /
Yeh, Chin Zeng No.90., Yuying St. Sanmin Dist. 807 Kaohsiung City / TW | |||
08 /
Chen, Ming-Hung No.31, Ln. 56, Jianxing Rd. Sanmin Dist. 807 Kaohsiung City / TW | |||
09 /
Huang, Chung-Teng No.65-1, Shigang St., Shigang Dist. 422 Taichung City / TW | |||
10 /
Fu, Hsueh Jen 3F., No.43-1, Songjiang St. Fengshan Dist. 830 Kaohsiung City / TW | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Tower 185 Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 35-37 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Westhafenplatz 1 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2014/21] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Westhafenplatz 1 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 13189809.0 | 23.10.2013 | [2014/21] | Priority number, date | TW20120143193 | 20.11.2012 Original published format: TW 101143193 | TW20130122642 | 26.06.2013 Original published format: TW 102122642 | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732970 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2732970 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B25/14, B32B17/10, B32B27/32, H01L31/048 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,CN);
B32B25/14 (EP,CN);
B32B17/10018 (EP);
B32B17/10788 (EP);
H01L31/049 (EP);
B32B2323/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Title | German: | Modulstruktur | [2014/21] | English: | Module structure | [2014/21] | French: | Structure de module | [2014/21] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 01.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2013 | AL | 24.06.2015 | AT | 24.06.2015 | BE | 24.06.2015 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | DK | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | ES | 24.06.2015 | FI | 24.06.2015 | HR | 24.06.2015 | IT | 24.06.2015 | LT | 24.06.2015 | LV | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | MK | 24.06.2015 | MT | 24.06.2015 | NL | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | RS | 24.06.2015 | SE | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | SM | 24.06.2015 | TR | 24.06.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | NO | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | IE | 23.10.2015 | LU | 23.10.2015 | IS | 24.10.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 23.10.2013 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
TR | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.10.2015 | ||
LU | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.10.2013 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.10.2015 | ||
LU | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 23.10.2013 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.10.2015 | ||
LU | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.10.2015 | ||
LU | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.10.2015 | ||
LU | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010000603 (TSUZUKI ATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0010] , [0072] - [0074] - [0091] , [0187] *; | [A]WO2012051930 (SUZHOU SUNSHINE NEW MATERIALS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [AP]US2013209795 (LIU XUEXI [CN]) [AP] 1-14 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0023] , [0044] , [0048] , [0055] , [0056] *; | [A]JP2012107107 (ARON KASEI KK) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006166023 (YOSHIKATA KUNIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0095] , [0096] * |