EP2730791 - Crankshaft, bearing assembly and large multi-cylinder two-stroke diesel engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Diesel & Turbo, filial af MAN Diesel & Turbo SE, Tyskland Teglholmsgade 41 2450 Copenhagen SV / DK | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olsson, Martin Sölvesborgsgatan 9 21436 Malmö / SE | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Nordic Patent Service A/S Bredgade 30 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [2016/01] |
Former [2014/20] | Nordic Patent Service A/S Højbro Plads 10 1200 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 13190123.3 | 24.10.2013 | [2014/20] | Priority number, date | DK20120000704 | 09.11.2012 Original published format: DK 201200704 | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2730791 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2730791 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16C3/08, F16C9/02, F16C23/08, F16C23/04 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
F16C3/08 (EP);
F16C9/02 (EP,KR);
F02F7/00 (KR);
F16C23/041 (EP);
F16C33/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2014/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kurbelwellenlageranordnung und großer mehrzylindriger Zweitaktdieselmotor | [2014/20] | English: | Crankshaft, bearing assembly and large multi-cylinder two-stroke diesel engine | [2014/20] | French: | Vilebrequin, ensemble de roulement et gros moteur diesel deux temps à cylindres multiples | [2014/20] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 22.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2013 | AL | 30.12.2015 | BE | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | IT | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 24.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 24.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 24.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | BE | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0800008 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 9-11 [I] 6; | [Y]EP2041418 (MAN DIESEL AS [DK]) [Y] 9-11 * figures 1-8 *; | [Y]DE4330565 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [Y] 10 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2847314 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * figures 1-4; claims 1-6,9,10 *; | [X]EP0168153 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 1 - page 5; figures 1,2, * |