EP2727803 - Track suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech USA, Inc. 703 S. Cleveland-Massillon Road Fairlawn, OH 44333-3023 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | For all designated states ContiTech USA, Inc. 703 S. Cleveland-Massillon Road Fairlawn OH 44333-3023 / US | ||
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states ContiTech USA, Inc. 703 S. Cleveland-Massillon Road Fairlawn OH 47433 / US | ||
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Veyance Technologies, Inc. 703 S. Cleveland-Massillon Road Fairlawn, OH 44333-3023 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagorcka, James A. P.O. Box 685 Hamilton, VIC 3300 / AU | 02 /
Allen, Lyal D. 86 Kent Road Hamilton, VIC 3300 / AU | [2017/07] |
Former [2014/19] | 01 /
Nagorcka, James A. P.O. Box 685 Hamilton, VIC 3300 / AU | ||
02 /
Allen, Lyall D. 86 Kent Road Hamilton, VIC 3300 / AU | Representative(s) | Preusser, Andrea Continental Aktiengesellschaft Intellectual Property Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [2017/07] |
Former [2014/19] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13190453.4 | 28.10.2013 | [2014/19] | Priority number, date | US201261721602P | 02.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261721602 P | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2727803 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2727803 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2727803 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/104, B62D55/112, B62D55/30 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
B62D55/104 (EP,US);
B62D55/112 (EP,US);
B62D55/14 (EP,US);
B62D55/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2014/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Raupenaufhängung | [2014/19] | English: | Track suspension | [2014/19] | French: | Suspension pour chenille | [2014/19] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 14.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2013 | AL | 15.02.2017 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | HR | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | MK | 15.02.2017 | NL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | RS | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | SM | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | NO | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | IE | 28.10.2017 | LU | 28.10.2017 | MT | 28.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.10.2013 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
MT | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.10.2013 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
MT | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.10.2013 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
MT | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.10.2013 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
MT | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
MT | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
MT | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5842757 (KELDERMAN GARY L [US]) [AD] 1,10 * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 38 *; | [A]US7131508 (BRAZIER GLEN [US]) [A] 1,10 * figure - * | by applicant | US3841424 | US5842757 | USRE36284E | US5316381 | US5340205 |