EP2865746 - Fractionation of hop oils using liquid and supercritical carbon dioxide. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marriott, Raymond 69 Gipsy Lane Kettering Northamptonshire NN16 8TZ / GB | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Roufosse, Micheline C. 2 Tai Glo Steeple Lane Beaumaris Gwynedd LL58 8EJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Roufosse, Micheline C. 2 TAI GLO Steeple Lane Beaumaris Gwynedd LL58 8EJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13190555.6 | 28.10.2013 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2865746 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12C3/08, C12C3/10 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
C12C3/08 (EP);
C12C3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fraktionierung von Hopfenölen mit Flüssigkeit und überkritischem Kohlendioxid | [2015/18] | English: | Fractionation of hop oils using liquid and supercritical carbon dioxide. | [2015/18] | French: | Fractionnement d'huiles de houblon utilisant du dioxyde de carbone supercritique et liquide | [2015/18] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 30.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0019462 (CARLTON & UNITED BREWERIES [AU]) [X] 10,11 * page 7 - page 8, paragraph 4; example -; claims 14, 15 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]EP1920777 (NOOKANDEH-BAUMGAERTNER ASLIEH [DE] NOOKANDEH-BAUMGAERTNER ASLIEH DR [D) [X] 10,11 * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0177]; tables 19-21 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]US2003138546 (GOLDSTEIN HENRY [US] ET AL) [X] 10,11 * paragraphs [0006] , [0042] , [ 0084]; figure 4 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]WO9925807 (MILLER BREWING [US]) [X] 10,11 * page 4, line 14 - line 32; figure 1 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]US3433642 (NAKAYAMA TOMMY ET AL) [X] 10,11 * column 5, paragraph 1; figure .; claim - * [A] 1-9; | [XAI]EP0679419 (STEINER HOPS LTD [GB]) [X] 10 * page 4, line 35 - line 52 * [A] 1-9 [I] 11 | by applicant | - MOIR M., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BREWING CHEMISTS, (2000), vol. 58, no. 4, page 131 | - MURRAY J.P.; WESTWOOD K.; DAOUD, Proceedings of the European Brewery Convention., OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS | - MARRIOTT R.J.; GARDNER D.S.J.; FINCHER M.; KEMP T., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 25TH CONVENTION OF THE INSTITUTE OF BREWING-ASIA PACIFIC SECTION, (1998), page 199 |