EP2722051 - Monomethylvaline compounds having phenylalanine side-chain modifications at the C-terminus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seattle Genetics, Inc. 21823 30th Drive, S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doronina, Svetlana O. 10910 198th Place SE Snohomish, WA 98296 / US | 02 /
Kline, Toni Beth 767 Bryant Street, No. 406 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/17] | 01 /
Doronina, Svetlana O. 10910 198th Place SE Snohomish, Washington 98296 / US | ||
02 /
Kline, Toni Beth 2034B NW 60th Street Seattle, Washington 981017 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | Andrews, Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2014/17] | Andrews, Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London Greater London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13190752.9 | 07.07.2006 | [2014/17] | Priority number, date | US20050697767P | 07.07.2005 Original published format: US 697767 P | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2722051 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2722051 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, C07K7/02 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
A61K47/65 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (US);
A61K47/6811 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
C07K5/0205 (EP,US);
C07K5/10 (US);
C07K7/02 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/17] | A61K38/00, C07K7/02, A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/17] | Title | German: | Monomethylvalinverbindungen mit Phenylalaninseitenkettenmodifikationen am C-Terminus | [2014/17] | English: | Monomethylvaline compounds having phenylalanine side-chain modifications at the C-terminus | [2014/17] | French: | Composés de monométhylvaline présentant des modifications de la chaîne latérale de phénylalanine au niveau de la terminaison C | [2014/17] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 13.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06786489.2 / EP1917020 | Divisional application(s) | EP18200998.5 / EP3498289 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060786489) is 25.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.09.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.02.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 13.02.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2006 | AT | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | LU | 07.07.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9413695 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * page 3; compound 70 * [I] 1-14; | [I]US5767237 (SAKAKIBARA KYOICHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO0118032 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [I] 1-14; | [XI]WO2004010957 (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * * pages 20-28 * [I] 1-14; | [XI]WO2004073656 (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * * pages 62-65 * [I] 1-14; | [XI]WO2005001038 (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [I] 1-14; | [XP]WO2005081711 (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - G Valle ET AL, "Constrained phenylalanine analogues. Preferred conformation of the 1,2,3,4-tetrahydroisoquinoline-3-carboxylic acid (Tic) residue", International journal of peptide and protein research, DENMARK, (19920901), pages 222 - 232, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/1335996, XP055105311 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - MIYAZAKI ET AL, "Synthesis and antitumor activity of novel dolastatin 10 analogs", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (19950101), vol. 43, no. 10, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 1706 - 1718, XP002080987 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 1714; table 6; compounds 1,28b * | by applicant | EP0012023 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | EP0184187 | WO8605807 | WO8702671 | US4694778 | WO8901036 | US4816567 | US4816397 | EP0404097 | US5047335 | US5122464 | WO9308829 | WO9311161 | US5225539 | US5229275 | WO9316185 | US5278299 | WO9404690 | US5500362 | US5510261 | US5545806 | US5545807 | US5565332 | US5567610 | US5569825 | US5571894 | US5573905 | US5583024 | US5585089 | US5587458 | US5589369 | US5591669 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5635483 | US5641870 | US5661016 | US5663149 | WO9734631 | US5674713 | US5677171 | US5700670 | US5731168 | WO9813059 | US5739277 | US5780588 | US5821337 | US5888809 | US6214345 | WO02088172 | US6602677 | US2004006215 | WO2004073656 | US2006083736 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - TORELLIS; ROBOTTI, COMPUT. APPL. BIOSCI., (1994), vol. 10, pages 3 - 5 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 8 | - HIGGINS ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1996), vol. 266, pages 383 - 402 | - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 92 | - CLYNES ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656 | - DAËRON, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 203 - 234 | - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 92 | - CAPEL ET AL., IMMUNOMETHODS, (1994), vol. 4, pages 25 - 34 | - DE HAAS ET AL., J. LAB. CLIN. MED., (1995), vol. 126, pages 330 - 41 | - GUYER, J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 117, page 587 | - KIM ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 249 | - GAZZANO-SANTORO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1996), vol. 202, page 163 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - PLÜCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - HOLLINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - JONES, NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329 | - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - WILMAN, "Prodrugs in Cancer Chemotherapy", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (1986), vol. 14, pages 375 - 382 | - "Prodrugs: A Chemical Approach to Targeted Drug Delivery", STELLA ET AL., Directed Drug Delivery, HUMANA PRESS, (1985), pages 247 - 267 | - The Chemistry of Heterocyclic Compounds, A series of Monographs, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1950), vol. 13, 14, | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1960), vol. 82, page 5566 | - HAMBLETT, K.J. ET AL., Effect of drug loading on the pharmacology, pharmacokinetics, and toxicity of an anti-CD30 antibody-drug conjugate, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH | - HAMBLETT ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 10, page 7063 | - 2004 ANNUAL MEETING, (20040327), vol. 45 | - ALLEY, S.C. ET AL., Controlling the Location of Drug Attachment in Antibody-Drug Conjugates, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH | - "2004 Annual Meeting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AACR, (20040327), vol. 45 | - KANEKO, T. ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM, (1991), vol. 2, pages 133 - 41 | - TOKI ET AL., J ORG. CHERN., (2002), vol. 67, pages 1866 - 1872 | - HAY ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1999), vol. 9, page 2237 | - RODRIGUES ET AL., CHEMISTRY BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 2, page 223 | - STORM ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1972), vol. 94, page 5815 | - AMSBERRY ET AL., J. ORG. CHERN., (1990), vol. 55, page 5867 | - KINGSBURY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1984), vol. 27, page 1447 | - WOYKE ET AL., ANTIMICROB. AGENTS AND CHEMOTHER., (2001), vol. 45, no. 12, pages 3580 - 3584 | - PETTIT ET AL., ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1998), vol. 42, pages 2961 - 2965 | - LAGUZZA ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1989), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 548 - 55 | - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protocols in Protein Science, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (2002), vol. 2 | - TENG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1983), vol. 80, pages 7308 - 7312 | - KOZBOR ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, pages 72 - 79 | - OLSSON, METH. ENZYMOL., (1982), vol. 92, pages 3 - 16 | - KABAT E ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGY, (1980), vol. 125, no. 3, pages 961 - 969 | - BERTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043 | - LIU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 3439 - 3443 | - LIU ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 139, pages 3521 - 3526 | - SUN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 214 - 218 | - NISHIMURA ET AL., CANCER. RES., (1987), vol. 47, pages 999 - 1005 | - WOOD ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 446 - 449 | - SHAW ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1988), vol. 80, pages 1553 - 1559 | - MORRISON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 1202 - 1207 | - OI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 214 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 552 - 525 | - VERHOEYAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, page 1534 | - BEIDLER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 141, pages 4053 - 4060 | - LONBERG; HUSZAR, INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - JESPERS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 12, pages 899 - 903 | - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, page 581 | - "The rise of monoclonal antibodies as therapeutics", QUAN; CARTER, Anti-IgE and Allergic Disease, MARCEL DEKKER, (2002), pages 427 - 469 | - TRAIL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, pages 212 - 215 | - TRAIL ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 57, pages 100 - 105 | - FRANCISCO ET AL., CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 3225 - 3231 | - BOWEN ET AL., J. IM11LUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, pages 5896 - 5906 | - WAHL ET AL., CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 62, no. 13, pages 3736 - 42 | - FRANKE ET AL., CANCER BIOTHER. RADIOPHARM., (2000), vol. 15, pages 459 - 76 | - MURRAY, SEMIN ONCOL., (2000), vol. 27, pages 64 - 70 | - KUTMEIER ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1994), vol. 17, page 242 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBOR ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72 | - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 77 - 96 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, page 624 | - HANE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, page 4937 | - HUTCHINSON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1978), vol. 253, page 6551 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1984), vol. 81, pages 851 - 855 | - NEUBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 604 - 608 | - TAKEDA ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 452 - 454 | - BIRD, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 42 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 334, pages 544 - 54 | - SKERRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 1038 - 1041 | - AUSUBEL, Molecular Cloning, A Laboratory Manual, 3rd ed.,, COLD SPRING HARBOR PUBLISH. | - FOECKING ET AL., GENE, (1998), vol. 45, page 101 | - COCKETT ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 2 | - RUTHER ET AL., EMBO J., (1983), vol. 2, page 1791 | - INOUYE; INOUYE, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 3101 - 3109 | - VAN HEEKE; SCHUSTER, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 24, pages 5503 - 5509 | - LOGAN; SHENK, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 355 - 359 | - BITTNER ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 153, pages 51 - 544 | - WIGLER ET AL., CELL, (1977), vol. 11, page 223 | - SZYBALSKA; SZYBALSKI, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 48, page 202 | - LOWY ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 22, page 817 | - WIGLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 357 | - O'HARE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 1527 | - MULLIGAN; BERG, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 2072 | - CLINICAL PHARMACY, vol. 12, pages 488 - 505 | - WU; WU, BIOTHERAPY, (1991), vol. 3, pages 87 - 95 | - TOLSTOSHEV, ANN. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (1993), vol. 32, pages 573 - 596 | - MULLIGAN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 926 - 932 | - MORGAN; ANDERSON, ANN. REV. BIOCHEIN., (1993), vol. 62, pages 191 - 217 | - MAY, TIB TECH, (1993), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 155 - 215 | - SANTERRE ET AL., GENE, (1984), vol. 30, page 147 | - COLBERRE-GARAPIN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1981), vol. 150, page 1 | - BEBBINGTON; HENTSCHEL, The use of vectors based on gene amplification for the expression of cloned genes in mammalian cells in DNA cloning, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), vol. 3 | - CROUSE ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, page 257 | - PROUDFOOT, NATURE, (1986), vol. 322, page 52 | - KOHLER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 2197 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103 | - KOZBOR, J. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 133, page 3001 | - BRODEUR ET AL., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 51 - 63 | - MUNSON ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 107, page 220 | - SKERRA ET AL., CURR. OPINION IN IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 5, pages 256 - 262 | - PLIICKTHUN, IMMUNOL. REVS., (1992), vol. 130, pages 151 - 188 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - MARKS ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - WATERHOUSE ET AL., NUC. ACIDS. RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - MORRISON, PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, page 6851 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - SIMS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2296 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, page 901 | - CARTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 4285 | - PRESTA ET AL., J. BNMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2623 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGERMANN ET AL., YEAR IN BNMUNO., (1993), vol. 7, page 33 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 553 | - JOHNSON; CHISWELL, CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 3, pages 564 - 571 | - GRIFFITH ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - MORIMOTO ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOCHENZICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL METHODS, (1992), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117 | - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 81 | - CARTER ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - MILLSTEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 539 | - TRAUNECKER ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659 | - SURESH ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1986), vol. 121, page 210 | - SHALABY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1992), vol. 175, pages 217 - 225 | - KOSTELNY ET AL., J. IRNNIUR2OL., (1992), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 1547 - 1553 | - GRUBER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, page 5368 | - TUTT ET AL., J. 1MMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, page 60 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - CARON ET AL., J. EXP MED., (1992), vol. 176, pages 1191 - 1195 | - SHOPES, J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 2918 - 2922 | - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 2560 - 2565 | - STEVENSON ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1989), vol. 3, pages 219 - 230 | - JEFFERIS; LUND, CHEM. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 65, pages 111 - 128 | - WRIGHT; MORRISON, TIBTECH, (1997), vol. 15, pages 26 - 32 | - BOYD ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 32, pages 1311 - 1318 | - WITTWE; HOWARD, BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 29, pages 4175 - 4180 | - WYSS; WAGNER, CURRENT OPIFI. BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 7, pages 409 - 416 | - MALHOTRA ET AL., NATURE MED., (1995), vol. 1, pages 237 - 243 | - UMANA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (1999), vol. 17, pages 176 - 180 | - HSE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 9062 - 9070 | - CROUCH ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1993), vol. 160, pages 81 - 88 | - CREE ET AL., ANTICANCER DRUGS, (1995), vol. 6, pages 398 - 404 | - SCHRODER; LUBKE, The Peptides, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1965), vol. 1, pages 76 - 136 | - E. SCHRODER; K. LUBKE, The Peptides, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1965), vol. 1, pages 76 - 136 | - PETTIT ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 111, pages 5463 - 5465 | - PETTIT ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1998), vol. 13, pages 243 - 277 | - PETTIT ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS., (1996), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 859 - 863 | - MIYAZAKI, CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1995), vol. 43, no. 10, pages 1706 - 1718 | - BOWMAN ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., (1950), pages 1342 - 1340 | - GREENE; WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, 2nd Edition,, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1991), page 506 | - WALKER, J. ORG. CHEM., (1995), vol. 60, pages 5352 - 5 | - FRISCH ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1996), vol. 7, pages 180 - 186 | - JONES ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2000), vol. 41, no. 10, pages 1531 - 1533 | - GILON ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1967), vol. 23, no. 11, pages 4441 - 4447 | - ANGEW. CHEM., (1975), vol. 87, no. 14, page 517 | - DUBOWCHIK ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1997), vol. 38, pages 5257 - 60 | - CROZET ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1985), vol. 26, pages 5133 - 5134 | - SUN ET AL., BIOORGAITIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2002), vol. 12, pages 2213 - 2215 | - SUN ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 11, pages 1761 - 1768 | - KLUSSMAN ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 765 - 773 | - GOODSON, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - AGNEW, CHEM IITTL. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186 | - WILLNER ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1993), vol. 4, page 521 | - SYNTHESIS, (1982), vol. 245, page 881 | - KANEKO ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 133 - 141 | - LAROCK, R.C., Comprehensive Organic Transformations, WILEY-VCH, (1999), page 1937 | - ZHOU ET AL., TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (1999), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 855 - 862 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2002), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 217 - 229 | - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 66, no. 4, pages 1339 - 1350 | - LAGO ET AL., JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 57, no. 12, pages 3493 - 6 | - RIGHI ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1996), vol. 37, no. 38, pages 6893 - 6896 | - BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1982), vol. 55, no. 9, pages 3049 - 50 | - MATHUR ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (2004), vol. 76, no. 2, pages 150 - 161 | - JONSSON; MIKIVER, ACTA PHANNACEUTICA SUECICA, (1976), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 75 - 8 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 38, no. 10, pages 1600 - 7 | - TOTH ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2004), vol. 126, no. 34, pages 10538 - 10539 | - SCHLOSSER ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2004), vol. 60, no. 35, pages 7731 - 7742 | - ROFF ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2004), vol. 126, no. 13, pages 4098 - 4099 | - RUIZ ET AL., JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 68, no. 20, pages 7634 - 7645 | - WANG ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2000), vol. 41, no. 9, pages 1307 - 1310 | - DAVIS ET AL., JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 64, no. 18, pages 6931 - 6934 | - EZQUERRA ET AL., JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 64, no. 18, pages 6554 - 6565 | - MENDOZA ET AL., "Promega Corp. Technical Bulletin TB288", CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 62, pages 5485 - 5488 |