EP2746312 - Epoxy resin compositions, methods of making same, and articles thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drumright, Ray E. 785 E Olson Road Midland, MI Michigan 48640 / US | 02 /
Hefner, Jr., Robert E. 350 Hunter Court Rosharon, TX Texas 77583 / US | 03 /
Wu, Jinghang 6113 Shirewood Circle Midland, MI Michigan 48642 / US | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13190894.9 | 30.10.2013 | [2014/26] | Priority number, date | US201261739837P | 20.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261739837 P | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2746312 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/24 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
C09D163/00 (EP,US);
C08G59/22 (KR);
C08G59/04 (KR);
C08G59/24 (EP,US);
C08G59/30 (KR);
C08G59/50 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Epoxidharzzusammensetzungen, Verfahren zur Herstellung davon und Artikel daraus | [2014/26] | English: | Epoxy resin compositions, methods of making same, and articles thereof | [2014/26] | French: | Compositions de résine époxy, leurs procédés de fabrication et articles associés | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 13.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US3334110 | - JAY, R.R., "Direct Titration of Epoxy Compounds and Aziridines", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (196403), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 667 - 668 | - ANGEW. MAKROMOL. CHEM., (1975), vol. 44, pages 151 - 163 |