EP2728136 - Ammonia slip detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Engine Intellectual Property Company, LLC 2701 Navistar Drive Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singh, Navtej 912 W. Nichols Road Arlington Heigts, IL Illinois 60004 / US | 02 /
Charintranond, Paul Boon 147 Richard Elmhurst, IL Illinois 60126 / US | 03 /
Miller, Michael James 600 W. Larkdale Lane Mt. Prospect, IL Illinois 60056 / US | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 13191156.2 | 31.10.2013 | [2014/19] | Priority number, date | US201261722123P | 02.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261722123 P | US201313943474 | 16.07.2013 Original published format: US201313943474 | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2728136 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01N11/00, F01N3/20, B01D53/94, F01N13/00 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
F01N3/208 (EP,US);
B01D53/9409 (EP,US);
B01D53/9495 (EP,US);
F01N11/00 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2062 (EP,US);
F01N2550/02 (EP,US);
F01N2560/026 (EP,US);
F01N2560/14 (EP,US);
F01N2900/08 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1402 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1616 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ammoniak-Schlupferkennung | [2014/19] | English: | Ammonia slip detection | [2014/19] | French: | Détection de glissement d'ammoniac | [2014/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102011114700 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 3,4; claims 1,9 * * page 6, paragraphs 35-37 *; | [X]WO2010096793 (CUMMINS EMISSION SOLUTIONS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * * page 12, line 16 - page 13, line 5 *; | [X]US2003182935 (KAWAI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2,8,9; claims 1,3 * * page 1, paragraphs 10,13 * * page 3, paragraph 42 *; | [X]US2010028228 (GADY KEVIN ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 12-15 * figure 2; claims 1,14 * * page 4, paragraphs 61-66 *; | [X]US2011005209 (GADY KEVIN ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 12-15 * page 2, paragraphs 29,30; figures 1-3; claims 1,9 *; | [X]US2010223908 (SOLBRIG CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 12-15 * figures 1-3; claims 1,11,12 * |