EP2712618 - Targeted delivery of drugs, therapeutic nucleic acids and functional nucleic acids to mammalian cells via intact killed bacterial cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EnGeneIC Molecular Delivery Pty Ltd. Building 2, 25 Sirius Road Lane Cove West NSW 2066 / AU | [2017/03] |
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states EnGeneIC Molecular Delivery Pty Ltd. 105 Delhi Road, Riverside Corporate Park North Ryde Sydney NSW 2113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAHMBHATT, Himanshu 96 Prairie Vale Road Bossley Park Sydney, New South Wales 2176 / AU | 02 /
MACDIARMID, Jennifer 8 Lombard Street Glebe Sydney, New South Wales 2037 / AU | [2016/42] |
Former [2014/14] | 01 /
Brahmbhatt, Himanshu 96 Prairie Vale Road Bossley Park Sydney, New South Wales 2176 / AU | ||
02 /
Macdiarmid, Jennifer 8 Lombard Street Glebe Sydney, New South Wales 2037 / AU | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | ||
Former [2014/14] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 13191266.9 | 20.06.2007 | [2014/14] | Priority number, date | US20060815883P | 23.06.2006 Original published format: US 815883 P | US20070909078P | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 909078 P | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712618 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2712618 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, C07K16/12, C07K16/28 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K47/46 (US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K31/711 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K47/6901 (EP,US);
A61K48/0008 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/1203 (EP,US);
C07K16/1235 (EP,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/14] | A61K35/74, A61K31/7105, A61K31/713, A61K31/7088, A61K31/711, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2014/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gezielte Verabreichung von Wirkstoffen, therapeutischen Nukleinsäuren und funktionellen Nukleinsäuren in Säugetierzellen mithilfe intakter getöteter Bakterienzellen | [2014/14] | English: | Targeted delivery of drugs, therapeutic nucleic acids and functional nucleic acids to mammalian cells via intact killed bacterial cells | [2014/14] | French: | Administration ciblée de médicaments, d'acides nucléiques thérapeutiques et d'acides nucléiques fonctionnels à des cellules mammaliennes via des cellules bactériennes tuées | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.03.2017 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07825666.6 / EP2040725 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070825666) is 14.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9507346 (AMERSHAM INT PLC [GB], et al); | [Y]DE19909770 (LUBITZ WERNER [AT]); | [Y]US6177083 (LUBITZ WERNER [AT]); | [Y]WO0232395 (ADVANCED DELIVERY SYSTEMS APS [DK], et al); | [Y]US2005222057 (BRAHMBHATT HIMANSHU [AU], et al); | [Y]US2006018877 (MIKSZTA JOHN A [US], et al); | by applicant | WO8101145 | US4496778 | WO8807378 | US4975278 | US4987071 | US5037743 | US5143830 | US5260203 | WO9521191 | US5455030 | US5530101 | US5585089 | US6025197 | WO0067776 | US2003004123 | US6639055 |