EP2730922 - Method and system for detecting lymphosarcoma in cats using biomarkers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veterinary Diagnostics Institute, Inc. 4685 Runway Street, Suite K Simi Valley, CA 93063 / US | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ringold, Randy 533 Box Canyon Road West Hills, CA 91304 / US | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2014/20] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 13192073.8 | 08.11.2013 | [2014/20] | Priority number, date | US201213672687 | 08.11.2012 Original published format: US201213672687 | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2730922 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2730922 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/57426 (EP,US);
G01N33/57407 (US);
G01N33/57488 (US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G01N2333/46 (US);
G01N2333/912 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] |
Former [2014/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Detektion von Lymphosarkom bei Katzen unter Verwendung von Biomarkern | [2014/20] | English: | Method and system for detecting lymphosarcoma in cats using biomarkers | [2014/20] | French: | Procédé et système de détection lymphosarcoma chez les chats à l'aide de biomarqueurs | [2014/20] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 02.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2013 | AL | 10.01.2018 | AT | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | HR | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | LT | 10.01.2018 | LV | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | MK | 10.01.2018 | NL | 10.01.2018 | PL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | RS | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | SM | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | NO | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IS | 10.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AL | 10.01.2018 | ||
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 10.01.2018 | |
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012142073 (RINGOLD RANDY [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [Y] - MISCHKE ET AL, "Changes in C-reactive protein and haptoglobin in dogs with lymphatic neoplasia", VETERINARY JOURNAL, BAILLIERE TINDALL, LONDON, GB, (20070608), vol. 174, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.TVJL.2006.05.018, ISSN 1090-0233, pages 188 - 192, XP022106623 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tvjl.2006.05.018 | [Y] - PALTRINIERI S, "Early Biomarkers of Inflammation in Dogs and Cats: The Acute Phase Proteins", VETERINARY RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS ; AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL PUBLISHING TOPICAL REVIEWS AND RESEARCH ARTICLES ON ALL ASPECTS OF THE VETERINARY SCIENCES, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20070716), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 1573-7446, pages 125 - 129, XP019534840 [Y] 1-15 * page 127, paragraph 4 - page 128 * | [Y] - ECKERSALL P D ET AL, "Acute phase proteins: Biomarkers of infection and inflammation in veterinary medicine", VETERINARY JOURNAL, BAILLIERE TINDALL, LONDON, GB, vol. 185, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.TVJL.2010.04.009, ISSN 1090-0233, (20100701), pages 23 - 27, (20100602), XP027470949 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tvjl.2010.04.009 |