EP2730240 - Liquid supply apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchida, Kazuaki c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Hirabayashi, Atsuya c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
Seto, Takeshi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 04 /
Matsuzaki, Takahiro c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/50] |
Former [2014/20] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13192132.2 | 08.11.2013 | [2014/20] | Priority number, date | JP20120248058 | 12.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012248058 | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2730240 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2730240 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/3203 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
A61B17/3203 (EP,US);
A61M5/1422 (US);
F04B11/005 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitszufuhrvorrichtung | [2014/20] | English: | Liquid supply apparatus | [2014/20] | French: | Dispositif de distribution de liquide | [2014/20] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 17.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2013 | AL | 10.12.2014 | AT | 10.12.2014 | BE | 10.12.2014 | BG | 10.12.2014 | CY | 10.12.2014 | CZ | 10.12.2014 | DK | 10.12.2014 | EE | 10.12.2014 | ES | 10.12.2014 | FI | 10.12.2014 | HR | 10.12.2014 | IT | 10.12.2014 | LT | 10.12.2014 | LV | 10.12.2014 | MC | 10.12.2014 | MK | 10.12.2014 | MT | 10.12.2014 | NL | 10.12.2014 | PL | 10.12.2014 | RO | 10.12.2014 | RS | 10.12.2014 | SE | 10.12.2014 | SI | 10.12.2014 | SK | 10.12.2014 | SM | 10.12.2014 | TR | 10.12.2014 | NO | 10.03.2015 | GR | 11.03.2015 | IS | 10.04.2015 | PT | 10.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MK | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
TR | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MK | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 10.12.2014 | |
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 10.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH09264261 (SUGINO MACH) [AD] 1,11,12 * figure - *; | [A]US2007129680 (HAGG MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,11,12 * abstract *; | [A]US2009060764 (MITZLAFF LOTHAR [PT], et al) [A] 1,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012046605 (UCHIDA KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,11,12* the whole document * |