EP2698393 - Resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [2015/30] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amano, Hiroshi c/o Ajinomoto Fine-Techno Co., Inc. 1-2, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 210-0801 / JP | 02 /
Kawahara, Shigeru c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 210-8681 / JP | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/08] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13192563.8 | 25.07.2008 | [2014/08] | Priority number, date | JP20070195141 | 26.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007195141 | [2014/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2698393 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2698393 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/40, C07D233/58, C07F9/54, C08G59/58, C08G75/08, C08L63/00 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
C07F9/5407 (EP,US);
C08G59/40 (KR);
B01J31/0277 (US);
C07D233/58 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/58 (KR);
C08G75/08 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2014/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung | [2014/08] | English: | Resin composition | [2014/08] | French: | Composition de résine | [2014/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 25.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08792038.5 / EP2174969 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080792038) is 11.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2008 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BE | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | ES | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | HR | 19.08.2015 | IT | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | NO | 19.11.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 25.07.2008 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.07.2008 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.07.2008 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 19.08.2015 | |
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2008138855 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,3,9 * Formulation 1; page 12, line 12; claim 17 *; | [E]US2008265201 (SPYROU EMMANOUIL [DE], et al) [E] 1,3,9 * Formulation 1; paragraph [0048]; claim 17 *; | [AP] - "Performances of bismuth vanadate", (20130228), URL: http://www.wwrchk.com/admin/upload/manufacturers/10_6618B_original.pdf, (20140113), XP055096088 [AP] 1,3,9 * page 1 * | [AP] - "Trihexyltetradecylphosphonium decanoate >=95.0% (NMR) | Sigma-Aldrich", (20140113), URL: http://www.sigmaaldrich.com/catalog/product/aldrich/50826?lang=en ion=NL#, (20140113), XP055096097 [AP] 1,3,9 | Examination | EP0458502 | by applicant | JPH06211969 | JP2000351829 | JP2001342253 | - POLIMERY, (2003), vol. 48, pages 833 - 835 | - J. POLYM. SCI. POLYM. PHYS., (1979), vol. 17, page 329 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1961), vol. 26, page 3467 |