EP2873454 - Reactor with plate fixing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALDOR TOPSØE A/S Nymøllevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states HALDOR TOPSOE A/S Nymøllevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RISBJERG JARLKOV, Klaus C/O Haldor Topsøe A/S Nymøllevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | 02 /
LYTZEN, Ulf Mørdrupvej 14 3060 Espergærde / DK | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Topsoe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Haldor Topsøe A/S Nymøllevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 13192678.4 | 13.11.2013 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873454 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/00, B01J8/02, B01J8/04 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
B01J8/0453 (EP,US);
B01J8/008 (EP,US);
B01J8/0214 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00884 (EP,US);
B01J8/0415 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reaktor mit Plattenfixierungssystem | [2015/21] | English: | Reactor with plate fixing system | [2015/21] | French: | Réacteur avec système de fixation de plaque | [2015/21] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2013 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 10.07.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2595384 (JOHNSEN JOHN H, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 6; figures 2, 3; claim - *; | [A]DE1086215 (PINTSCH BAMAG AG) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 1 - line 13 * * column 3, line 3 - line 47-; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5916529 (SCHEUERMAN GEORGIEANNA L [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** column 14, line 58 - column 18, line 11; figures 10-13; claim - * |