EP2733607 - A method of increasing capacity to process operational data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ScienceLogic, Inc. 10700 Parkridge Boulevard Suite 200 Reston, VA 20191 / US | [2016/40] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states AppFirst, Inc. 6 West 14th Street, Suite 4E New York NY 10011 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rochette, Donn 3408-30th Avenue Fenton, IA 50539 / US | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Meier, Florian Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13193081.0 | 15.11.2013 | [2014/21] | Priority number, date | US201261726900P | 15.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261726900 P | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2733607 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2733607 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F11/34, // G06F11/30, G06F11/20, G06F16/27 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G06F9/5083 (EP,US);
G06F16/27 (US);
G06F11/3433 (EP,US);
G06F11/3442 (EP,US);
G06F11/2094 (EP,US);
G06F11/3006 (EP,US);
G06F2201/865 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/33] | G06F9/50, G06F11/34, // G06F11/30 | ||
Former IPC [2014/21] | G06F9/50, // G06F11/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2014/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Kapazität zur Verarbeitung von Betriebsdaten | [2014/21] | English: | A method of increasing capacity to process operational data | [2014/21] | French: | Procédé d'accroissement de la capacité à traiter des données opérationnelles | [2014/21] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 09.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.03.2022 | 10.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/31] | 31.03.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7080378 (NOLAND THOMAS NELSON [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I]US2008082983 (GROETZNER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2375337 (APPFIRST INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I] - Geoffrey Hoffman ET AL, "Auto scaling your website with Amazon Web Services (AWS) - Part 2 | Cardinal Path Blog", (20120731), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120731104022/http://www.cardinalpath.com/autoscaling-your-website-with-amazon-web-services-part-2/, (20160705), XP055285875 [I] 1-7 * page 2 * | [A] - Anonymous, "FAQ - OpenTSDB - A Distributed, Scalable Monitoring System", (20120815), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120815121137/http://opentsdb.net/faq.html#Reliability, (20160705), XP055285884 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2008222160 | - High Performance Cluster Computing: Architectures and Systems, PRENTICE HALL PTR, (1999), vol. 1 | - KATE MATSUDAIRA, "Scalable Web Architecture and Distributed Systems", THE ARCHITECTURE OF OPEN SOURCE APPLICATIONS, URL: http://www.aosabook.org/en/distsys.html |