EP2738351 - Rotor blade with tear-drop shaped part-span shroud [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chouhan, Rohit John F. Welch Technology Centre Pvt. Ltd. Plott 122, EPIP, Phase II Hoodi Village Whitefield Road 560066 Bangalore / IN | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13193148.7 | 15.11.2013 | [2014/23] | Priority number, date | US201213691478 | 30.11.2012 Original published format: US201213691478 | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2738351 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/22 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
F01D5/22 (EP,US);
F01D5/225 (US);
F05D2250/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rotorschaufel mit einem Tränenförmig geformten Dämpfer in einer Teilhöhe des Schaufelblatts | [2014/23] | English: | Rotor blade with tear-drop shaped part-span shroud | [2014/23] | French: | Aube de turbine avec amortisseur de vibrations en forme de goutte d'eau localisé sur la hauteur de l'aube | [2014/23] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 19.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 12.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5257908 (ORTOLANO RALPH J [US]) [Y] 8,9 * column 1, line 5 - line 9; figure 2 *; | [YD]US5695323 (PFEIFER NATHAN R [US], et al) [YD] 8* column 1, line 5 - line 10 *; | [XY]US2011158810 (SHIBUKAWA NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0045] - [0047] - [0062] , [0073] - [0077]; figures 1,2,6,7,11,12 * [Y] 4-6,9,12-14; | [XY]US8105038 (OOTOMO FUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10,11,15 * column 1, line 15 - line 20; figures 5-8,12,15,16 * [Y] 4-6,9,12-14 | by applicant | US5695323 |