EP2835983 - Hearing instrument presenting environmental sounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2015/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pedersen, Regin Kopp Oticon A/S c/o Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Hans Jørgen Vind Demant A/S IP Management Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Nielsen, Hans Jørgen Vind Oticon A/S IP Management Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | Application number, filing date | 13193426.7 | 19.11.2013 | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2835983 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, H04R25/00 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
H04R25/43 (EP);
H04R1/1083 (EP);
H04R2225/41 (EP);
H04R2420/07 (EP);
H04R25/407 (EP);
H04R25/554 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hörgerät mit Darstellung der Umweltgeräusche | [2015/07] | English: | Hearing instrument presenting environmental sounds | [2015/07] | French: | Instrument auditif présentant les sons de l'environnement | [2015/07] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2013 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 12.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 18.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008083315 (PERSONICS HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1-10,12,13 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] - [0029] - [0033] , [0034] , [0036] , [0000] , [0041] , [0043] , [0057] * [I] 11; | [XI]US2002141599 (TRAJKOVIC MIROSLAV [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12,13 * figures 2-3 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] - [0024] - [0029] * [I] 11; | [X]JP2008300894 (SMK KK) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,12,13 * abstract *; | [X]EP1646265 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * paragraphs [0038] , [0049] , [0053] , [0055] *; | [X]GB2477809 (HOSIDEN BESSON LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,9 * page 3, lines 13-23 * * page 1, lines 22-29 * | by applicant | EP2472907 |