EP2736259 - Display apparatus and method of controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/22] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ha, Tae-hyeun 5-409, Imgwang Apt., Maetan 3-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Seo, Je-hwan 106-107, Hyeophwa Mansion, Jisan 2-dong Suseong-gu Daegu / KR | [2014/22] | Representative(s) | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/22] | Application number, filing date | 13194157.7 | 22.11.2013 | [2014/22] | Priority number, date | KR20120133924 | 23.11.2012 Original published format: KR 20120133924 | [2014/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2736259 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
H04N13/341 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (US);
H04N2013/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2014/22] | English: | Display apparatus and method of controlling the same | [2014/22] | French: | Appareil d'affichage et son procédé de contrôle | [2014/22] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011159929 (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0192] - paragraph [0198]; figure 28 *; | [X]WO2011099780 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]US2011285829 (MORI GO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 48 - page 4, paragraph 58; figures 2,5 * * page 6, paragraph 77 - page 6, paragraph 79; figures 2-4 * * page 8, paragraph 108 - page 9, paragraph 115; figure 6 * * page 10, paragraph 127 - page 10, paragraph 130; figure 8 * * page 11, paragraph 145 - page 12, paragraph 157; figure 10 *; | [A]US2011285905 (MUIKAICHI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 39 - page 4, paragraph 51; figures 1-3 *; | [XP]EP2536155 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [XP] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0108]; figure 7 * |