EP2811381 - Touch detection method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spreadtrum Communications (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. Spreadtrum Center, Building 1 Lane 2288, Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Huawei Spreadtrum Communications (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. Spreadtrum Center, Building No. 1, Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road, Zhangjiang 201203 Shanghai / CN | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2014/50] | Application number, filing date | 13194227.8 | 25.11.2013 | [2014/50] | Priority number, date | WO2013CN76800 | 05.06.2013 Original published format: PCT/CN2013/076800 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2811381 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/045 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
G06F3/045 (EP,CN,US);
G06F2203/04104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] |
Former [2014/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Berührungserkennungsverfahren und Vorrichtung | [2014/50] | English: | Touch detection method and device | [2014/50] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection tactile | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 13.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/06] | 30.09.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN102520835 (SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS INC) [X] 1-26 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0110] *; | [X]WO2012073261 (CELANI ANDREA [IT], et al) [X] 1-26 * page 6, line 8 - page 11, line 15; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2009322701 (D SOUZA HENRY M [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0062]; figure 6 *; | [X]US2011102464 (GODAVARI SRI VENKATESH [IN]) [X] 1-26 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0070]; figure 6 *; | [X]US2009109191 (FELDER MATTHEW D [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0063] *; | [A]US2012262417 (WAKASUGI JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,14 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0120] * | by applicant | WO2009038277 |