EP2879399 - WIRELESS MONITORING METHOD AND DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/23] | Wireless monitoring method and device thereof | ||
[2017/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVERSPRING INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 3/F, No. 50, Sec 1, Zhonghua Road Tucheng District New Taipei City 23666 / TW | [2017/42] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states EVERSPRING INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 3/F, No. 50, Sec 1, Zhonghua Road Tucheng District New Taipei City 23666 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiang, Chien-Ming 3F., No.50, Sec. 1, Zhonghua Rd. 236 Tucheng Dist., New Taipei City / TW | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Loo, Chi Ching Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | [2017/42] |
Former [2015/23] | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 13195106.3 | 29.11.2013 | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879399 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2879399 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP);
H04Q2209/43 (EP);
H04Q2209/823 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2015/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES ÜBERWACHUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2017/24] | English: | WIRELESS MONITORING METHOD AND DEVICE THEREOF | [2017/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE SANS FIL ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2017/24] |
Former [2015/23] | Drahtloses Überwachungsverfahren und Vorrichtung dafür | ||
Former [2015/23] | Wireless monitoring method and device thereof | ||
Former [2015/23] | Procédé de surveillance sans fil et dispositif associé | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 16.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2013 | AL | 18.10.2017 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | IE | 29.11.2017 | LU | 29.11.2017 | MT | 29.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 29.11.2013 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 29.11.2013 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 29.11.2013 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.11.2013 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 18.10.2017 | |
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005055417 (REICH JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0105] * * claims 1, 3, 6 *; | [A]US2007182584 (OGINO ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0049]; claims 1, 2 *; | [A]GB2443021 (HINDS IAN [GB]) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 2 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 24 * * page 4, line 25 - page 7, line 5 * * claim 1 * | by applicant | US8194695 | US2011310770 |