EP2879441 - Terminal device and method for radio-network-scan operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto M2M GmbH St.-Martin-Strasse 60 81541 München / DE | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulrich, Thomas Rudolf-Bart-Siedlung 11 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 02 /
Breuer, Volker Schwalbenring 20 16727 Boetzow / DE | 03 /
Wehmeier, Lars Leistikowstrasse 62 14612 Falkensee / DE | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Grevin, Emmanuel Gemalto SA Avenue du Jujubier ZI Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | [2015/23] | Application number, filing date | 13195125.3 | 29.11.2013 | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879441 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04L41/0806 (US);
H04W60/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Endgerätevorrichtung und Verfahren für Radionetzwerkabtastoperation | [2015/23] | English: | Terminal device and method for radio-network-scan operation | [2015/23] | French: | Dispositif terminal et procédé de fonctionnement radio-réseau-scan | [2015/23] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2013 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 13.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005043026 (BROK JACCO [NL], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0096] * * claim 7 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2005113028 (UCHIDA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] ** figure 10 *; | [Y]US2009068969 (LINDOFF BENGT [SE], et al) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2011117909 (CAO YAXIN [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0070] *; | [A]US2012066366 (BLAISDELL JAMES [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0038] * * figure 4 * * abstract *; | [Y]US2012322504 (CHOU SHUANG-AN [TW], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 4a-4d * * figure 9 * | by applicant | - MOHAMMAD T. KAWSER ET AL., "Downlink SNR to CQI Mapping for Different Multiple Antenna Techniques in LTE", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INFORMATION AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERING, (201209), vol. 2, no. 5, page 757FF |