EP2706751 - Data structure, recording medium, playing device and playing method, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchimura, Kouichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13195256.6 | 09.04.2010 | [2014/11] | Priority number, date | JP20090099413 | 15.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009099413 | JP20100063056 | 18.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010063056 | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2706751 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2706751 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04, G11B20/12, H04N5/92, G11B27/30, G11B27/32, H04N5/85, H04N9/82, H04N13/00, H04N21/426, H04N21/431, H04N21/432, H04N21/488 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
H04N9/8233 (EP,US);
H04N5/92 (KR);
G11B20/12 (KR);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N13/111 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/183 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N21/42646 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (EP,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/4884 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/11] | H04N13/04, G11B20/12, H04N5/92 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Title | German: | Datenstruktur, Aufzeichnungsmedium, Abspielvorrichtung und Abspielverfahren und Programm | [2014/11] | English: | Data structure, recording medium, playing device and playing method, and program | [2014/11] | French: | Structure de données, support d'enregistrement, dispositif de jeu et procédé de jeu et programme | [2014/11] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 07.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2018 | 12.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/18] | 24.12.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10764399.1 / EP2290997 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100764399) is 12.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003095177 (YUN KUG-JIN [KR], et al) [I] 1-4 * the whole document * * paragraph [0115]; figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]KR20080107955 (ECT INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | US2010171812 [ ] (KIM KYU HEON [KR], et al) [ ] * the whole document *; | [A]EP1501316 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0182] - [0204]; figures 33A-39C * | by applicant | JP2004304767 |