EP2749208 - Object information acquiring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/27] | Object information acquiring apparatus and object information acquiring method | ||
[2018/47] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | 01.07.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2019/17] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Shuichi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
Abe, Hiroshi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/27] | Application number, filing date | 13195412.5 | 03.12.2013 | [2014/27] | Priority number, date | JP20120286546 | 28.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012286546 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2749208 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2749208 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2749208 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/14, A61B8/00, G06T5/00, G06T5/50, A61B5/00 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
A61B5/7425 (EP,US);
A61B5/0095 (EP,CN,US);
A61B8/14 (US);
A61B5/0035 (EP,US);
A61B5/72 (CN);
A61B5/7435 (EP,US);
A61B8/4272 (EP,US);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T5/94 (EP,US);
A61B5/748 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10132 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20104 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2014/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Objektinformationserfassungsvorrichtung und Objektinformationserfassungsverfahren | [2021/31] | English: | Object information acquiring apparatus | [2018/47] | French: | Appareil d'acquisition d'informations d'objets et procédé d'acquisition d'informations d'objets | [2021/31] |
Former [2014/27] | Objektinformationserfassungsvorrichtung und Objektinformationserfassungsverfahren | ||
Former [2014/27] | Object information acquiring apparatus and object information acquiring method | ||
Former [2014/27] | Appareil d'acquisition d'informations d'objets et procédé d'acquisition d'informations d'objets | Examination procedure | 29.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 05.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2020
28.01.2020
ADMISSIBLE Beck, Michaël A. T. IPLodge BV Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE Opponent's representative IPLodge bv Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2020
28.01.2020
ADMISSIBLE Beck, Michaël A. T. IPLodge BV Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE Opponent's representative IPLodge bvba Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | 07.02.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.06.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.06.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.06.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2013 | AL | 24.04.2019 | AT | 24.04.2019 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | DK | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | ES | 24.04.2019 | FI | 24.04.2019 | HR | 24.04.2019 | IT | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MC | 24.04.2019 | MK | 24.04.2019 | MT | 24.04.2019 | NL | 24.04.2019 | PL | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | RS | 24.04.2019 | SE | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | SM | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | NO | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | PT | 24.08.2019 | GB | 03.12.2019 | IE | 03.12.2019 | LU | 03.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | FR | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 03.12.2013 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
MT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
GB | 03.12.2019 | ||
IE | 03.12.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 03.12.2013 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
GB | 03.12.2019 | ||
IE | 03.12.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
GB | 03.12.2019 | ||
IE | 03.12.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
GB | 03.12.2019 | ||
IE | 03.12.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
GB | 03.12.2019 | ||
IE | 03.12.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 03.12.2019 | ||
LU | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 24.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5042077 (BURKE THOMAS M [US]) [I] 1-10* column 4, line 60 - column 8, line 18; figure -; claim - *; | [I]US5797397 (ROSENBERG MARK [US]) [I] 1-10 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 50 *; | [I]US2003053668 (DITT HENDRIK [DE], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0013] - [0016] - [0020] - [0022] , [0032] - [0047]; figure -; claim - *; | [XI]US2004220465 (CAFARELLA JOHN H [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0024] , [0076] , [0117] , [0134] - [0135] - [0169]; figure -; claim - * [I] 2-10; | [XI]EP1493380 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0039] , [0042] , [0059] - [0062] - [0067] , [0086] - [0093] - [0162] * [I] 6,10; | [XI]US2010049044 (BURCHER MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0015] , [0022] - [0024] - [0028] - [0033] - [0041] - [0051]; figure -; claim - * [I] 6,10; | [I]WO2012014390 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [I] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0005] , [0018] - [0036] - [0061] - [0065]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]JP2012075464 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0025] , [0027] - [0056] - [0065] - [0072]; figure -; claim - *; | [XI] - RONALD E KUMON ET AL, "Frequency-Domain Analysis of Photoacoustic Imaging Data From Prostate Adenocarcinoma Tumors in a Murine Model", ULTRASOUND IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 37, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.ULTRASMEDBIO.2011.01.012, ISSN 0301-5629, (20110120), pages 834 - 839, (20110128), XP028192411 [X] 1-5 * page 836 - page 838; figure - * [I] 6-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultrasmedbio.2011.01.012 | [XI] - JAEGER M ET AL, "Improved contrast deep optoacoustic imaging using displacement-compensated averaging: breast tumour phantom studies;Improved contrast deep optoacoustic imaging of breast phantoms", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL GB, (20110818), vol. 56, no. 18, doi:10.1088/0031-9155/56/18/008, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 5889 - 5901, XP020210558 [X] 1,4,5 * page 5893 - page 5898 * [I] 2,3,6-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/56/18/008 | [X] - DE LA ZERDA A ET AL, "Ultrahigh sensitivity carbon nanotube agents for photoacoustic molecular imaging in living mice", NANO LETTERS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1021/NL100890D, ISSN 1530-6984, (20100609), pages 2168 - 2172, (20100525), XP002690836 [X] 1,5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl100890d | by applicant | JP2005021580 | Opposition | US5042077 | US5797397 | EP0646263 | US2003053668 | US2004220465 | EP1493380 | JP2005021580 | US2010049044 | US2010179413 | WO2012014390 | JP2012075464 | WO2013056089 | - RONALD E KUMON et al., "Frequency-Domain Analysis of Photoacoustic Imaging Data from Prostate Adenocarcinoma Tumors in a Murine Model", ULTRASOUND IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20110120), vol. 37, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.ultrasmedbio.2011.01.012, pages 834 - 839, XP028192411 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultrasmedbio.2011.01.012 | - JAEGER M et al., "Improved contrast deep optoacoustic imaging using displacement- compensated averaging: breast tumour phantom studies; Improved contrast deep optoacoustic imaging of breast phantoms", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, BRISTOL GB, (20110818), vol. 56, no. 18, doi:10.1088/0031-9155/56/18/008, pages 5889 - 5901, XP020210558 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/56/18/008 | - DE LA ZERDA A et al., "Ultrahigh sensitivity carbon nanotube agents for photoacoustic molecular imaging in living mice", NANO LETTERS, (20100609), vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1021/nl100890d, pages 2168 - 2172, XP002690836 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl100890d | - SONG HU et al., "Label-free photoacoustic ophthalmic angiography", Optics Letters, (20100101), vol. 35, no. 1, doi:10.1364/OL.35.000001, pages 1 - 3, XP001551093 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.35.000001 | - XUEDING WANG et al., "Noninvasive imaging of hemoglobin concentration and oxygenation in the rat brain using high-resolution photoacoustic tomography", Journal of Biomedical Optics, vol. 11, no. 2, (20060300), page 024015, (20060503), XP055202984 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.2192804 | - SONG HU et al., "Label-free photoacoustic ophthalmic angiography", Optics Letters, (20100101), vol. 35, no. 1, doi:10.1364/OL.35.000001, pages 1 - 3 |