EP2881302 - Rail vehicle with selective external shading [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens AG Österreich Siemensstraße 90 1210 Wien / AT | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachmayer, Thomas Am Graedenerweg Gr. 1 Parz. 1 1210 Wien / AT | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13195609.6 | 04.12.2013 | [2015/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881302 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B61D25/00, B60J1/20, B60J3/00 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
B61D25/00 (EP,US);
E06B9/40 (US);
B60J1/10 (EP,US);
B60J1/2011 (EP,US);
B60J1/2013 (EP,US);
B61D1/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schienenfahrzeug mit selektiver Außenbeschattung | [2015/24] | English: | Rail vehicle with selective external shading | [2015/24] | French: | Véhicule ferroviaire doté d'un ombrage extérieur sélectif | [2015/24] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2013 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 18.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1399253 (ROCCO FABRIZIO) [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-10 * page 1, line 59 - page 1, line 100; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US1755736 (NELS JENSEN) [A] 1 * page 1, line 66 - page 3, line 51; figure 14 *; | [A]US2657089 (KAUL ARTHUR A) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 74; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]WO9323262 (AUTO SHADE INC [US], et al) [Y] 8-10 * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 18; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5588476 (TRETHEWEY BRIG E A [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 12 - column 7, line 14; figures 1-19 *; | [A]US5664615 (BAIK SEONG-GON [KR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 10; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]FR2804069 (LEMIERE PHILIPPE [FR]) [Y] 1,6 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2006082192 (DUBAY STEVEN C [US], et al) [A] 1* page 2, paragraph 30 - page 3, paragraph 30; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2006231220 (HUANG SUNNY E [US]) [Y] 1,2,4 * page 5, paragraph 88 - page 6, paragraph 89; figures 26,27 * |