EP2747313 - Information terminal and communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawa, Yoshinori FUNAI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 7-1, 7-chome, Nakagaito Daito-shi, Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 02 /
Muraoka, Masaru FUNAI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 7-1, 7-chome, Nakagaito Daito-shi, Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [2014/26] | Application number, filing date | 13196158.3 | 09.12.2013 | [2014/26] | Priority number, date | JP20120277581 | 20.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012277581 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2747313 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B11/00 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H04B11/00 (EP,US);
G08B6/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationsgerät und Kommunikationssystem | [2014/26] | English: | Information terminal and communication system | [2014/26] | French: | Terminal d'informations et de communication | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 09.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1265326 (LENNOX/NEWSTEAD) [X] 1* page 3, line 17 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [XA]US2011132424 (RAKIB SELIM SHLOMO [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * page 3, paragraph 33 - paragraph 39; figures 4-7 * * page 5, paragraph 47 - paragraph 50 * * page 7, paragraph 73 * [A] 4 | by applicant | JP2000183828 |