EP2881806 - Acoustic dispersion membrane for a musical watch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montres Breguet SA 1344 L'Abbaye / CH | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karapatis, Polychronis Nakis Rue du Collège 4 1324 Premier / CH | 02 /
Kadmiri, Younes 26A Rue Saint Fort 25660 Morre / FR | 03 /
Sarchi, Davide Place de la Gare 12 1020 Renens / CH | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Giraud, Eric, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2019/26] |
Former [2015/24] | Giraud, Eric, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13196237.5 | 09.12.2013 | [2015/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881806 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2881806 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10K1/10, G04B23/08, G04B37/00, G10K9/20, G04B21/08 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
G04B37/0075 (EP,US);
G04B21/08 (EP,US);
G04B23/08 (EP,US);
G10K1/10 (EP,US);
G10K9/20 (EP,US);
H04R7/02 (EP,US);
H04R7/127 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | G04B21/08, G04B23/08, G04B37/00, G10K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2015/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schallabstrahlungsmembran für eine Armbanduhr mit Spieluhr | [2015/24] | English: | Acoustic dispersion membrane for a musical watch | [2015/24] | French: | Membrane de rayonnement acoustique pour une montre musicale | [2015/24] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 13.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2019 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2013 | AL | 26.06.2019 | AT | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | ES | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | IT | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | NL | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | RS | 26.06.2019 | SE | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | IE | 09.12.2019 | LU | 09.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 09.12.2013 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 09.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.12.2013 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 09.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 09.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 09.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 09.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR1064970 (LOUIS GIROD & CIE) [X] 1-4,6,9 * column 1, paragraph 2 * * figure - * [I] 5; | [XA]CH304446 (ROAMER WATCH CO SA [CH]) [X] 1-4,7,11,17,19,20 * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 3, paragraph 9 * [A] 12-16,18; | [XA]DE1080029 (E H HELMUT JUNGHANS DR ING, et al) [X] 1,11,12 * figure 1 * * claim 1 * [A] 15; | [A]US3906713 (SUDA HARUO, et al) [A] 12,15 * figure 4 *; | [X]EP1795978 (LANGE UHREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,21,22 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] *; | [AD]EP2461219 (MONTRES BREGUET SA [CH]) [AD] 15* the whole document *; | [XA]EP2503417 (MONTRES BREGUET SA [CH]) [X] 1,11,17,21,22 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * figure 2 * [A] 18 |