EP2720493 - Method and apparatus for performing handover using packet data convergence protocol (PDCP) reordering in mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2020/28] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Seong-Hun C/O Samsung Electronics Co., LTD 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jeong, Kyeong-In C/O Samsung Electronics Co., LTD 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
van Lieshout, Gert Jan C/O Samsung Electronics Co., LTD 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
van der Velde, Himke C/O Samsung Electronics Co., LTD 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2014/16] | Application number, filing date | 13196530.3 | 19.10.2007 | [2014/16] | Priority number, date | KR20060101842 | 19.10.2006 Original published format: KR 20060101842 | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2720493 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2720493 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2720493 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/02, H04L1/18 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
H04L1/1841 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W28/04 (KR);
H04W36/0064 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/249 (EP,CN,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | H04W36/02, H04W28/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2014/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausführen eines Handovers durch Neuanordnung eines Paketdatenkonvergenzprotokolls in einem mobilen Kommunikationssystem | [2014/16] | English: | Method and apparatus for performing handover using packet data convergence protocol (PDCP) reordering in mobile communication system | [2014/16] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour effectuer un transfert utilisant un enregistrement de protocole de convergence de données en paquet (PDCP) dans un système de communication mobile | [2014/16] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 26.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.01.2020 | 20.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07020522.4 / EP1915017 | Divisional application(s) | EP15158692.2 / EP2914034 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070020522) is 03.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0777396 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al); | [Y]EP1276293 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); |